EP0951160 - Apparatus and method to provide a wireless telephone with no dial pad [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Communication, Inc. 900 Broken Sound Parkway Boca Raton FL 33287 / US | [2006/02] |
Former [1999/42] | For all designated states Siemens Information and Communication Networks, Inc. 900 Broken Sound Parkway Boca Raton, Florida 33487 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lester, Leland 10709 Culberson Drive Austin, TX 78748 / US | 02 /
Iglehart, David 2006 Westbridge Drive Austin, TX 78704 / US | [1999/42] | Representative(s) | Berg, Peter European Patent Attorney Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/02] | Berg, Peter European Patent Attorney, Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/27] | Payne, Janice Julia Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/42] | Allen, Derek Siemens Group Services Limited, Intellectual Property Department, Siemens House, Oldbury Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 8FZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99105734.0 | 22.03.1999 | [1999/42] | Priority number, date | US19980061795 | 16.04.1998 Original published format: US 61795 | [1999/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0951160 | Date: | 20.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0951160 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | [2004/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/02 | [1999/42] | CPC: |
H04M1/0279 (EP);
H04M1/23 (EP);
H04M2250/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/45] |
Former [1999/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gerät und Verfahren zur Realisierung eines schnurlosen Telefons ohne Tastatur | [1999/42] | English: | Apparatus and method to provide a wireless telephone with no dial pad | [1999/42] | French: | Appareil et méthode de réalisation d'un téléphone sans fil sans clavier | [1999/42] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/14] | 16.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/18] | 30.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9721295 (BADARNEH) [Y] 1-14 * page 4, line 7 - line 36 * * figures 3A-3D,,4 *; | [Y]DE19528734 (SIEMENS AG) [Y] 1-14,1,4-6,9-11,13,14 * column 1, line 3 - line 26 * * column 1, line 37 - column 2, line 10 * * figures 1-7 *; | [Y]EP0463856 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD) [Y] 1,4-6,9-11,13,14 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - line 3 * * column 1, line 38 - line 52 * * column 2, line 21 - line 35 * * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 7 * * column 3, line 31 - line 54 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5332322 (GAMBARO) [A] 1,4-6,9-11,13 * abstract * * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 33 * * column 4, line 20 - column 5, line 19 * * figures 1-7 *; | [A]JPH0614092 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940419), vol. 018, no. 218, Database accession no. (E - 1539), & JP06014092 A 19940121 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1,4,5,9-11,13 * abstract * * figure 1 * |