EP0945298 - Fuel tank [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.11.2004 [2004/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/39] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishikawa, Takashi c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
Arase, Tomoyasu c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
Kobayashi, Masahide c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 04 /
Miura, Katsuyuki c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 05 /
Hyodo, Yoshihiko c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [1999/39] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/39] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99105759.7 | 22.03.1999 | [1999/39] | Priority number, date | JP19980074276 | 23.03.1998 Original published format: JP 7427698 | JP19980289508 | 12.10.1998 Original published format: JP 28950898 | [1999/47] |
Former [1999/39] | JP19980074276 | 23.03.1998 | |
JP19980289508 | 10.12.1998 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0945298 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0945298 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | [2000/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0945298 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60K15/03 | [1999/39] | CPC: |
B60K15/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/30] |
Former [1999/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kraftstofftank | [1999/39] | English: | Fuel tank | [1999/39] | French: | Réservoir de carburant | [1999/39] | Examination procedure | 22.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/39] | 22.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5596971 (KIDOKORO TORU [JP]) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | JPH08170568 [ ] (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]US5722374 (KIDOKORO TORU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column A; figure 1 *; | [A]US3347406 (KATZENMEYER EDWIN B) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]US4008831 (VIDILLES JACQUES) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US3887104 (COLE DAVID F) [A] 1 * column W * |