EP0951006 - Information displaying apparatus and information providing system using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.03.2003 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.05.2003 [2003/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Total Net Co., Ltd. 3-9-3, Nishishinjuku, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [1999/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ando, Fusao c/o Nippon Total Net Co., Ltd. 3-9-3, Nishishinjuku, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [1999/42] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2003/01] |
Former [1999/42] | Prechtel, Jörg, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99105795.1 | 22.03.1999 | [1999/42] | Priority number, date | JP19980100635 | 27.03.1998 Original published format: JP 10063598 | JP19990061762 | 09.03.1999 Original published format: JP 6176299 | [1999/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0951006 | Date: | 20.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0951006 | Date: | 03.11.1999 | [1999/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G09F27/00, G06F19/00 | [1999/42] | CPC: |
G09F27/00 (EP);
G09F9/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/28] |
Former [1999/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Informationsanzeigeapparat und seine Verwendung in einem Informationsdarbietungssystem | [1999/42] | English: | Information displaying apparatus and information providing system using the same | [1999/42] | French: | Appareil pour affichage de l'information et son utilisation dans un système fournissant de l'information | [1999/42] | Examination procedure | 22.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/42] | 01.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/19] | 03.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]DE2911102 (TRADIS S A) [X] 1,2,5 * page 10, lines 21-27 * * page 14, lines 5-11 * * page 26, line 20 - page 28, line 26 * * page 30, line 33 - page 31, line 20; figure 6 * [A] 13,16,19 [Y] 11,12; | [A]FR2535881 (BAL CLAUDE [FR]) [A] 1-4,6,7,9,10,14,15,17,18,20,21 * page 1, lines 1-18 * * page 4, columns 20-2 * * page 7, lines 1-12 * * page 8, lines 5-11 * * page 10, columns 1-7 * * page 10, line 24 - page 11, line 28; figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE19637854 (HEINZEL FRIEDHELM [DE]) [A] 1-3,5,6,8,9 * column 1, lines 8-42 * * column 4, lines 31-42; figure 1 *; | [A]JPH1056521 (ERUOUJIYU KK) [A] 1,12; | [A]WO9741654 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1,11,12 * abstract * * page 4, line 18 - page 5, line 20 * * page 10, lines 14-29; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO9430000 (NEW BRUNSWICK TELEPHONE CO [CA], et al) [Y] 11 * page 6, lines 4-14 * * page 11, line 33 - page 12, line 34 * * page 15, lines 11-25 * * page 17, line 34 - page 19, line 21 * * page 21, lines 6-16; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]DE19703610 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [Y] 12 * column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 31; figure 1 * |