Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3080881U | Global Dossier | 12.10.2001 | U | Priority number | Date | JP2001001921 | 05.04.2001 | JP10063598 | 27.03.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001094520 | Global Dossier | 06.04.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2000248604 | 18.08.2000 | JP10063598 | 27.03.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH11341194 | Global Dossier | 10.12.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP6176299 | 09.03.1999 | JP10063598 | 27.03.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0951006 | Global Dossier | 03.11.1999 | A3 | EP0951006 | 20.10.1999 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP6176299 | 09.03.1999 | JP10063598 | 27.03.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100323956B | 16.02.2002 | B1 | KR19990078300 | 25.10.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP6176299 | 09.03.1999 | JP10063598 | 27.03.1998 |