EP0995856 - Filter for cistern [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.2005 [2005/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEP Umwelttechnik GmbH Bogestrasse 98 53783 Eitorf / DE | [2000/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ehlert, Ulrich Am Kapellenhof 40 53783 Eitorf / DE | [2000/17] | Representative(s) | Lenzing, Andreas Lenzing Gerber Patentanwälte Postfach 20 05 09 40103 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/17] | Lenzing, Andreas, Dr. Lenzing Gerber Patentanwälte Münsterstrasse 248 40470 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 99105874.4 | 23.03.1999 | [2000/17] | Priority number, date | DE1998147655 | 15.10.1998 Original published format: DE 19847655 | [2000/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0995856 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E04D13/08, B01D35/02 | [2000/17] | CPC: |
B01D35/02 (EP);
E04D13/08 (EP);
B01D2201/48 (EP);
E04D2013/082 (EP);
E04D2013/086 (EP);
E04D2013/0866 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, LI, NL [2001/01] |
Former [2000/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Zisternenfilter | [2000/17] | English: | Filter for cistern | [2000/17] | French: | Filtre de citerne | [2000/17] | Examination procedure | 14.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/50] | 30.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/10] | 07.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   19.04.2002 | 31.03.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0548397 (WINKLER NORBERT [DE]) [X] 1-3,7,12,13 * the whole document *; | [X]DE3812136 (WINKLER NORBERT [DE]) [X] 1-3,7,12,13 * the whole document *; | [X]DE19650023 (MOSER PETER [DE]) [X] 1-3,7,12,13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0093203 (BORCHERT WERNER [DE]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]DE29716642U (WINKLER NORBERT [DE]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]DE29704565U (GEIGER ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document * | by applicant | US1230024 | DE2908620 | DE3518305 | DE7635684U |