Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0947492 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0947492



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 83
11.08.2004 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
28.08.2003 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
06.08.2003 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
06.08.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
06.08.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
17.04.2003 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
17.04.2003 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
17.04.2003 Text intended for grant Search / examination 13
14.11.2002 Description Search / examination 4
14.11.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
25.07.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
25.07.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.03.2000 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
12.10.1999 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
25.08.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
19.08.1999 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
19.08.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
19.08.1999 European search report Search / examination 1
18.05.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.03.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
24.03.1999 Claims Search / examination 2
24.03.1999 Description Search / examination 11
24.03.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
24.03.1999 General authorisation Search / examination 1
24.03.1999 Priority document Search / examination 15
24.03.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6