Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.09.2004 [2004/40] |
23.04.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.06.2004 [2004/24] |
22.08.2003 | (Expected) grant | published on 08.10.2003 [2003/41] |
16.08.2003 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
16.08.2003 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
10.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
21.03.2003 | Renewal fee | |
20.11.2002 | Examination report or reply | |
26.07.2002 | First examination report | |
22.07.2002 | Examination report or reply | |
05.04.2002 | Renewal fee | |
27.03.2001 | Renewal fee | |
26.06.2000 | Change - extension states | |
28.04.2000 | Definitive list of designations | published on 14.06.2000 [2000/24] |
31.03.2000 | Request for examination filed | published on 17.05.2000 [2000/20] |
20.08.1999 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 06.10.1999 [1999/40] |