blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0947492

EP0947492 - Process for the preparation of citral [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.08.2004
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip13.08.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.09.2004  [2004/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
4070 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [1999/40]For all designated states
F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG
4070 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Bonrath, Werner
140 Haslacherstrasse
79115 Freiburg / DE
[1999/40]
Application number, filing date99105903.124.03.1999
[1999/40]
Priority number, dateEP1998010575730.03.1998         Original published format: EP 98105757
[1999/40]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0947492
Date:06.10.1999
Language:DE
[1999/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0947492
Date:08.10.2003
Language:DE
[2003/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.08.1999
ClassificationIPC:C07C45/51, C07C47/20
[1999/40]
CPC:
C07C45/512 (EP,US)
C-Set:
C07C45/512, C07C47/21 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/24]
Former [1999/40]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Citral[1999/40]
English:Process for the preparation of citral[1999/40]
French:Procédé pour la préparation de citral[1999/40]
Examination procedure23.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/20]
25.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.08.2003Fee for grant paid
06.08.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.07.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE08.01.2004
[2004/24]
Documents cited:Search[DY]GB1204754  (RHONE POULENC SA [FR]) [DY] 1-10 * page 1 - page 3; example 23 *;
 [Y]EP0240431  (RHONE POULENC SANTE [FR]) [Y] 1-10 * page 2, line 59 - page 3, line 53 *
 [DX]  - C.Y. LORBER AND J.A. OSBORN, "Cis-dioxomolybdenum (VI) complexes as new catalysts for the Meyer-Schuster Rearrangement", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1996), vol. 37, no. 6, pages 853 - 856, XP004030279 [DX] 1-10 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-4039(95)02324-0
 [Y]  - ERMAN, M. B. ET AL, "The rearrangement of tertiary propargyl alcohols to.alpha.,.beta.-unsaturated aldehydes in the presence of polymeric organosilyl vanadates", TETRAHEDRON LETT. (1976), (34), 2981-4 CODEN: TELEAY, XP002107749 [Y] 1-10 * page 2984 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(01)85506-4
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.