blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0950813

EP0950813 - Swivel bearing for a swash plate in an axial piston machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.05.2006
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip12.05.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.06.2006  [2006/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Brueninghaus Hydromatik GmbH
Glockeraustrasse 2
89275 Elchingen / DE
[2005/27]
Former [1999/42]For all designated states
BRUENINGHAUS HYDROMATIK GMBH
Glockeraustrasse 2
89275 Elchingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Lemmen, Ralf, Dr.
Eugenstrasse 25
72072 Tübingen / DE
[1999/42]
Representative(s)Körfer, Thomas, et al
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 33 06 09
80066 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/42]Körfer, Thomas, Dipl.-Phys., et al
Mitscherlich & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date99105952.824.03.1999
[1999/42]
Priority number, dateDE199811692616.04.1998         Original published format: DE 19816926
[1999/42]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0950813
Date:20.10.1999
Language:DE
[1999/42]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0950813
Date:14.06.2000
[2000/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0950813
Date:06.07.2005
Language:DE
[2005/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.04.2000
ClassificationIPC:F04B1/20
[1999/42]
CPC:
F16C33/26 (EP); F04B1/2085 (EP); F16C17/02 (EP);
F16C27/02 (EP); F16C2360/00 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2001/08]
Former [1999/42]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Axialkolbenmaschine mit einer in einem Schwenklager schwenkbar gelagerten Schrägscheibe[1999/42]
English:Swivel bearing for a swash plate in an axial piston machine[1999/42]
French:Palier pivotant d'un plateau en biais dans une machine à pistons axiaux[1999/42]
Examination procedure08.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/41]
11.01.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.03.2005Fee for grant paid
22.03.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.04.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
26.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
27.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
08.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[DA]US5017095  (BURGESS ROY T [US], et al) [DA] 1 * column 3, line 5 - column 5, line 18; figures 1-17 *;
 [A]EP0237750  (BRUENINGHAUS HYDRAULIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [DA]DE19538835  (BRUENINGHAUS HYDROMATIK GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE2100028  (VEB KOMBINAT ORSTA-HYDRAULIK BETRIEB INDUSTRIEWERKE) [A] 1 * figures 1,4,5 *
by applicantDE19538835
 EP0327012
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.