blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0975162

EP0975162 - Television program recording system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.03.2007
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.05.2007  [2007/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/02]For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
TOSHIBA VIDEO PRODUCTS JAPAN CO., LTD.
1-1-1, Shibaura, Minato-ku
Tokyo-to 105-8001 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yasuzato, Masashi
2339-16 Omaeda, Hanazono-machi
Oosato-gun, Saitama-ken 369-1246 / JP
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date99106163.108.04.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateJP1998020821923.07.1998         Original published format: JP 20821998
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0975162
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0975162
Date:05.12.2001
[2001/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.10.2001
ClassificationIPC:H04N5/782
[2000/04]
CPC:
H04N5/782 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2002/35]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Fernsehprogrammaufnahmesystem[2000/04]
English:Television program recording system[2000/04]
French:Système d'enregistrement de programme de télévision[2000/04]
Examination procedure08.04.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
12.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.10.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/18]
24.11.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
13.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
17.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9421081  (MANKOVITZ ROY J [US]) [A] 1,12 * page 10, line 2 - page 12, line 4; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5684878  (NAGURA KAZUHIRO [JP]) [A] 1,3,12,15 * column 1, line 18 - line 46 * * column 4, line 35 - column 7, line 21; figure 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.