EP0995793 - Apparatus for the culture and the concentration of non-adherent cells and for the coculture of two distinct sort of cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.07.2003 [2003/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GSF-Forschungszentrum für Umwelt und Gesundheit GmbH Ingolstädter Landstrasse 1 85764 Oberschleissheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/17] | For all designated states GSF-Forschungszentrum für Umwelt und Gesundheit, GmbH Ingolstädter Landstrasse 1 85764 Oberschleissheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lodri, Antal Radolfzellerstrasse 14 81243 München / DE | 02 /
Kremer, Jean-Pierre, Dr. Hauptstrasse 28 86853 Langgeringen 23 / DE | 03 /
Reisbach, Gilbert, Dr. Lampadiusstrasse 2 80637 München / DE | 04 /
Liu, Guoquing, Prof.Dr., Chongquing Univ.Medic.Sc. Dept.Clinic.&Exper.Hematology, Yi Xue Yun Lu 1 Chongquing 400046 / CN | [2000/49] |
Former [2000/17] | 01 /
Lodri, Antal Radolfzellerstrasse 14 81243 München / DE | ||
02 /
Kremer, Jean-Pierre, Dr. Hauptstrasse 28 86853 Langgeringen 23 / DE | |||
03 /
Reisbach, Gilbert, Dr. Lampadiusstrasse 2 80637 München / DE | |||
04 /
Liu, Guoquing, Prof. Dr., Dpmt. of Clinical and Experimentel Hematology, Chongquing Uni of Medical Yi Xue Yun Lu 1, Chongquing 400046 / CN | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/17] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99106210.0 | 12.04.1999 | [2000/17] | Priority number, date | DE19981044154 | 25.09.1998 Original published format: DE 19844154 | [2000/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0995793 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/04, C12M1/24, C12M3/06 | [2000/17] | CPC: |
C12M23/08 (EP,US);
C12M23/34 (EP,US);
C12M35/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2001/01] |
Former [2000/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Kultivierung und Konzentrierung nicht adhärenter Zellen sowie zur Kokultur zweier unterschiedlicher Zellsorten | [2000/17] | English: | Apparatus for the culture and the concentration of non-adherent cells and for the coculture of two distinct sort of cells | [2000/17] | French: | Appareil pour la culture et la concentration de cellules non adhérentes ainsi que la coculture de deux sortes de cellules différentes | [2000/17] | Examination procedure | 26.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/47] | 09.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/28] | 10.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5449617 (FALKENBERG FRANK W [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,6-13 * figure -; claim - *; | [X]EP0725134 (NPBI BV [NL]) [X] 1,2,5-7 * figure -; claim - *; | [X]EP0620274 (UNIV SANTIAGO COMPOSTELA [ES]) [X] 1-3,6-9,11,12 * figure -; claim - *; | [X]DE839245 (KANZ EWALD DR MED) [X] 1,2,6-9,12 * page 3, line 5 - line 98; figure -; claim - *; | [X]EP0444585 (BALLIES UWE [DE]) [X] 1,2,8 * figure -; claim - *; | [X]EP0049954 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) [X] 1 * claim - *; | [X]EP0700990 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [X] 1,2,5-8,10-13 * column 6, line 17 - column 7, line 37; figure -; claim - *; | [A]US3919053 (NAZEMI MALEK M); | [A]GB2268187 (UNIV HULL [GB]) [A] * figure -; claim - *; | [A]JPS61274798 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870430), vol. 011, no. 136, Database accession no. (C - 419), & JP61274798 A 19861204 (INOUE JAPAX RES INC) [A] 1 * abstract * |