EP0978914 - Lead seal block for protective circuit arrangements and series build-in switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heinrich Kopp AG Alzenauer Strasse 66-70 D-63796 Kahl / DE | [2000/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seubert, Bernd Würzburger Strasse 280 63808 Haibach / DE | 02 /
Appel, Peter Wilhelm-Leuschner-Strasse 40 63512 Hainburg / DE | [2000/06] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/06] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99106230.8 | 13.04.1999 | [2000/06] | Priority number, date | DE19982014053U | 05.08.1998 Original published format: DE 29814053 U | [2000/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0978914 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H02B1/06 | [2000/06] | CPC: |
H01H9/0264 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR [2000/42] |
Former [2000/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Plombierleiste für Schutzschaltgeräte und Reiheneinbauschalter | [2000/06] | English: | Lead seal block for protective circuit arrangements and series build-in switch | [2000/06] | French: | Barre de plombage pour cabine de distribution de protection et interrupter encastré de serié | [2000/06] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/17] | 08.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/18] | 24.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2006 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4007746 (ALCATEL) [A] 1; | [A]DE3832535 (LICENTIA) [A] 1 |