EP0949797 - Image communication apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.07.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maeda, Toru c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [1999/41] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/41] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99106387.6 | 29.03.1999 | [1999/41] | Priority number, date | JP19980099195 | 10.04.1998 Original published format: JP 9919598 | JP19980099196 | 10.04.1998 Original published format: JP 9919698 | [1999/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0949797 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0949797 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | [2001/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/00 | [1999/41] | CPC: |
H04N1/00214 (EP,US);
H04N1/00209 (EP,US);
H04N1/00217 (EP,US);
H04N1/33307 (EP,US);
H04N1/33323 (EP,US);
H04N1/33338 (EP,US);
H04N1/33376 (EP,US);
H04N1/33392 (EP,US);
H04N2201/002 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0068 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0086 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3205 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3207 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3209 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3274 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/48] |
Former [1999/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bildübertragungsgerät und -verfahren | [1999/41] | English: | Image communication apparatus and method | [1999/41] | French: | Dispositif de communication d'images et procédé pour la communication d'images | [1999/41] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/37] | 28.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/32] | 29.06.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.09.2010 | 03.09.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | EP06120417.8 / EP1744533 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH07336462 ; | [Y]JPH07288634 ; | [A]WO9710668 (KULAKOWSKI ROBERT T [US]) [A] 1-88* abstract *; | [A]EP0812100 (MURATA MACHINERY LTD [JP]) [A] 1-88 * abstract *; | [X]EP0818916 (MURATA MACHINERY LTD [JP]) [X] 1,9,12,20,23,25,27,42,52,75,82 * abstract * * column 6, line 28 - line 32 * * figures 1,4,5,10 *; | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960430), vol. 1996, no. 04, & JP07336462 A 19951222 (CANON INC) [Y] 1,9,12,20,23,25,27,42,52,75,82 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 1996, no. 02, & JP07288634 A 19951031 (CANON INC) [Y] 1,9,12,20,23,25,27,42,52,75,82 * abstract * | [A] - K. TOYODA, H. OHNO, J. MURAI, D. WING, "Simple Mode of Facsimile Using Internet Mail", RFC SPECIFICATIONS RFC2305.TXT, (19880301), URL: http://www.normos.org/en/lists/ietf/rfc, (20010112), XP002156457 [A] 1-88 * the whole document *; page 7 * |