EP0947715 - Screw for fibrous material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Walther, Uli 1812 West Riverdale Road Thunder Bay Ontario P7C 4V2 / CA | For all designated states Walther, Gerda 1812 West Riverdale Road Thunder Bay Ontario P7C 4V2 / CA | For all designated states Walther, Mirco 370-725 James Street S. Thunder Bay Ontario P7E 6N3 / CA | For all designated states Walther, Thorsten 582 Nobel Road Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 3YB / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1999/40] | For all designated states Walther, Uli 1812 West Riverdale Road Thunder Bay Ontario P7C 4V2 / CA | ||
For all designated states Walther, Gerda 1812 West Riverdale Road Thunder Bay Ontario P7C 4V2 / CA | |||
For all designated states Walther, Mirco 370-725 James Street S. Thunder Bay, Ontario P7E 6N3 / CA | |||
For all designated states Walther, Thorsten 582 Nobel Road Thunder Bay, Ontario P7B 3YB / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Walther, Uli 1812 West Riverdale Road Thunder Bay, Ontario P7C 4V2 / CA | 02 /
Walther, Mirco 370-725 James Street S. Thunder bay, Ontario P7E 6N3 / CA | 03 /
Walther, Thorsten 582 Nobel Road Thunder Bay, Ontario P7B 3Y8 / CA | [1999/40] | Representative(s) | Hörner, Andreas, et al HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/40] | Hörner, Andreas, et al Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte GBR Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 99106524.4 | 30.03.1999 | [1999/40] | Priority number, date | CA19982234040 | 03.04.1998 Original published format: CA 2234040 | [1999/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0947715 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0947715 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16B33/02, // F16B5/01 | [1999/40] | CPC: |
F16B25/0015 (EP,US);
F16B25/0052 (EP,US);
F16B35/048 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [2000/24] |
Former [1999/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schraube für Fasermaterial | [1999/40] | English: | Screw for fibrous material | [1999/40] | French: | Vis pour matériaux fibreux | [1999/40] | Examination procedure | 15.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/06] | 07.04.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT | 22.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.05.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.05.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3472119 (PETERSON CARL B JR) [A] 1 * figure 1 ** claim 1 *; | [A]EP0553907 (TEXTRON INC [US]) [A] 1 * column 7, line 22 - line 54 * * figures 1,11 * |