Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0949743
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
24.02.2006 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 12.04.2006 [2006/15] |
02.11.2005 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
04.05.2005 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
08.04.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.04.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
31.05.2002 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
31.05.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
30.04.2002 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
29.08.2001 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
21.06.2001 |
Change - extension states |
|
08.05.2001 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
22.03.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
20.02.2001 |
Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) |
|
16.02.2001 |
Change - designated states |
published on 04.04.2001 [2001/14] |
13.02.2001 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
13.02.2001 |
Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) |
|
09.02.2001 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 28.03.2001 [2001/13] |
02.02.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.03.2001 [2001/12] |
02.06.2000 |
Publication of search report |
published on 19.07.2000 [2000/29] |
02.06.2000 |
Change - classification |
published on 19.07.2000 [2000/29] |
27.08.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.10.1999 [1999/41] |