EP0949743 - Electrical machine, in particular for lift driving apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.04.2006 [2006/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ATB Antriebstechnik AG Industriestrasse 60 73642 Welzheim / DE | [1999/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rietzschel, Eckehard Dr. Lenzholzstrasse 101 51515 Kürten / DE | 02 /
Wieland, Helmut Oberer Wasen 50 73642 Welzheim / DE | [1999/41] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Beier, Schöndorf und Mütschele Willy-Brandt-Strasse 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 99106572.3 | 31.03.1999 | [1999/41] | Priority number, date | DE1998115962 | 09.04.1998 Original published format: DE 19815962 | [1999/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0949743 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0949743 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | [2000/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H02K7/10, H02K7/102, B66B11/04, B66B5/02 | [2000/29] | CPC: |
H02K7/1025 (EP);
H02K7/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/41] | H02K7/10, H02K7/102, B66B11/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2001/14] |
Former [2001/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, LI | ||
Former [1999/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektrische Maschine, insbesondere für Fahrstuhlantrieb | [1999/41] | English: | Electrical machine, in particular for lift driving apparatus | [1999/41] | French: | Machine électrique, notamment pour dispositif d'entraînement pour ascenseur | [1999/41] | Examination procedure | 18.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/12] | 20.01.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE | 01.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/15] | 08.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.02.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.02.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.02.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.02.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.02.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.02.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 19.02.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.02.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.02.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.02.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.02.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.02.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.02.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.02.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   17.05.2002 | 31.03.2005 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE19500589 (KOERSGEN HEINZ NORBERT DIPL IN) [X] 1-4,7-9,11 * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 6 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 10; | [XY]DE4233759 (BLOCHER ELEKTROMOTORENWERK DRE) [X] 1-3,15 * claims 1,6 * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 11-14,16; | [Y]EP0733577 (KONE OY) [Y] 11-14,16 * column 2, line 17 - line 41 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]DE29615921U (KONE OY) [Y] 10 * page 8, line 6 - line 23 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2974756 (ELDRON G. ROEHM) [A] 5,6,10 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 9 * * column 3, line 37 - line 40 * * figure 1 * |