EP1043109 - Assembling method through welding of a coil with an integrated circuit or a small electronic unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EM Microelectronic-Marin SA Rue des Sors 3 2074 Marin / CH | [2000/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Doering, Elko Alte Bielstrasse 3 2572 Mörigen / CH | 02 /
Cattin, Pascal Rue Laurent-Péroud 7 2088 Cressier / CH | 03 /
Thiemann, Uwe Dorfstrasse 46 2076 Gals / CH | [2004/29] |
Former [2000/41] | 01 /
Doering, Elko Alte Bielstrasse 3 2572 Möringen / CH | ||
02 /
Cattin, Pascal Rue Laurent-Péroud 7 2088 Cressier / CH | |||
03 /
Thiemann, Uwe Dorfstrasse 46 2076 Gals / CH | Representative(s) | Laurent, Jean, et al I C B Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Rue des Sors 7 2074 Marin / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/41] | Laurent, Jean, et al I C B Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Rue des Sors 7 CH-2074 Marin / CH | Application number, filing date | 99106603.6 | 31.03.1999 | [2000/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1043109 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1043109 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B23K20/10 | [2000/41] | CPC: |
B23K20/10 (EP,US);
H05K1/18 (KR);
B23K2101/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, IT, LI, NL [2001/26] |
Former [2000/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Verbinden von einer Spule mit einer Mikroschaltung oder einer kleinen elektronischen Einheit durch Schweissen | [2000/41] | English: | Assembling method through welding of a coil with an integrated circuit or a small electronic unit | [2000/41] | French: | Procédé d'assemblage par soudage d'une bobine avec un circuit intégré ou une unité électronique de petites dimensions | [2000/41] | Examination procedure | 11.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/24] | 06.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 25.10.2004 | BE | 31.03.2005 | [2006/13] |
Former [2005/23] | ES | 25.10.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5057661 (BANNER ALVIN C [US]) [Y] 7,8,10 * column 4, paragraph 3 ** column 6, paragraph 1; figures 5,6 *; | [Y]US5186378 (ALFARO RAFAEL C [US]) [Y] 2 * abrégé;; figures 1,2 *; | [XY]US5493069 (CONTI RICHARD F [US]) [X] 1,3-6,11,12 * column 3, paragraph L * * column 4, paragraph L - column 5, paragraph 1; figures 4,5 * [Y] 2,7,8,10 |