blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0963843

EP0963843 - Apparatus for jetting ink utilizing lamb wave and method for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  14.09.2007
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2007Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 17.10.2007  [2007/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416, Maetan-dong
Paldal-gu
Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR
[N/P]
Former [1999/50]For all designated states
SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu
Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Seo, O-gweon
404, Hwahong Apartment, 377-5, Kimyangjang-dong
Yongin-city, Kyungki-do / KR
02 / Nam, Seung-ho
111-704, Sunkyung Apt. 536 Yatop-dong, Bundang-gu
Sungnam-city, Kyungki-do / KR
03 / Choi, Byoung-Iyong
530-48, Bangbae-3-dong, Seocho-gu
Seoul / KR
04 / Song, Young-jin
106, Hanwuri 2nd Apartment, Yuckbuk-dong
Yongin-city, Kyungki-do / KR
[1999/50]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/50]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99106644.031.03.1999
[1999/50]
Priority number, dateKR1998002183812.06.1998         Original published format: KR 9821838
[1999/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0963843
Date:15.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0963843
Date:23.08.2000
[2000/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.07.2000
ClassificationIPC:B41J2/045, B41J2/14, B41J2/16, B41J2/04
[2000/34]
CPC:
B41J2/14008 (EP,US); B41J2/04 (KR)
Former IPC [1999/50]B41J2/045, B41J2/14, B41J2/16
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/19]
Former [1999/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Tintenstrahlvorrichtung unter Verwendung von Lambwellen und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung[1999/50]
English:Apparatus for jetting ink utilizing lamb wave and method for manufacturing the same[1999/50]
French:Dispositif d'éjection d'encre utilisant des ondes de Lamb et méthode de fabrication de ce dispositif[1999/50]
Examination procedure01.04.1999Examination requested  [1999/50]
25.07.2007Application withdrawn by applicant  [2007/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
30.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
28.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
28.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH09183225  ;
 US5953027  [ ] (SUWABE YASUFUMI [JP], et al) [ ] * abstract * * column 2, line 33 - column 3, line 4 * * column 4, line 8 - line 28 * * column 8, line 1 - column 10, line 16 * * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]EP0387863  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1,13,14 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0430087  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1,13,14 * abstract * * column 3, line 32 - column 4, line 3 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]EP0728584  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1,13,14 * abstract * * column 5, line 10 - line 58 * * figures 3A-3C *;
 [A]JPH0650870  ;
 [A]JPH0755680
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971128), vol. 1997, no. 11, & JP09183225 A 19970715 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [A] 1-4,6 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940527), vol. 018, no. 281, Database accession no. (P - 1744), & JP06050870 A 19940225 (NEC CORP) [A] 1-12 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950731), vol. 1995, no. 06, & JP07055680 A 19950303 (NEC CORP) [A] 1-12 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.