Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19821635 | 21.09.2006 | B4 | DE19821635 | 21.10.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE29806694 | 15.04.1998 | DE19816434 | 15.04.1998 | DE19821635 | 14.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0964217 | Global Dossier | 25.06.2003 | B1 | EP0964217 | 15.12.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19816434 | 15.04.1998 | DE19821635 | 14.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL186729B | 27.02.2004 | B1 | PL332490 | 25.10.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19816434 | 15.04.1998 | DE19821635 | 14.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT964217E | 31.10.2003 | E | Priority number | Date | DE19816434 | 15.04.1998 | DE19821635 | 14.05.1998 |