EP0964217 - Firing shelf assembly for furnace car [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.06.2004 [2004/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saint-Gobain IndustrieKeramik Rödental GmbH Oeslauer Str. 35 96472 Rödental / DE | [2002/48] |
Former [1999/50] | For all designated states Maschinen- und Stahlbau Julius Lippert GmbH & Co. Böttgerstrasse 46 92690 Pressath / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schneider, Wolfgang Hallstrasse 15a 96515 Sonneberg / DE | 02 /
Zeis, Hans Pressather Strasse 24 92711 Parkstein / DE | [1999/50] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Kanzlerstrasse 8a 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1999/50] | LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ & SEGETH Postfach 3055 90014 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 99106674.7 | 01.04.1999 | [1999/50] | Priority number, date | DE1998116434 | 15.04.1998 Original published format: DE 19816434 | DE1998121635 | 14.05.1998 Original published format: DE 19821635 | [1999/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0964217 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0964217 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F27D5/00 | [1999/50] | CPC: |
F27D5/0006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | IT, PT [2000/34] |
Former [1999/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Ofenwagen-Brennregal | [1999/50] | English: | Firing shelf assembly for furnace car | [1999/50] | French: | Etagère de cuisson pour chariot de four | [1999/50] | Examination procedure | 27.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/50] | 23.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0325671 (SIGRI); | [A]EP0067451 (P.HUBERTUS); | [A]GB440621 (B.J.MOORE); | [A]US2118641 (G.S.DIAMOND); | [A]EP0037842 (ACME MARIS LD) |