EP0991050 - Method of manufacturing a screen made of a plurality of flat display panels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/14] | Method of manufacturing a screen made of a plurality of flat display panels and heat radiator mechanism for flat display panels | ||
[2004/05] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/14] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kimura, Kazuo c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
Hemmi, Kazuhisa c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
Ogura, Kazumasa c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2000/14] | Representative(s) | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/14] | Popp, Eugen, Dr., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99106697.8 | 01.04.1999 | [2000/14] | Priority number, date | JP19980277152 | 30.09.1998 Original published format: JP 27715298 | [2000/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0991050 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0991050 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | [2000/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G09F9/313, H01J17/49, H01J17/28 | [2000/14] | CPC: |
G09F9/313 (EP,US);
G09F9/00 (KR);
H05K7/20963 (EP,US);
H05K7/20972 (EP,US);
H01J2217/492 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/24] |
Former [2000/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines, aus einer Mehrzahl von flachen Anzeigetafeln gebildetes Bildschirms | [2004/05] | English: | Method of manufacturing a screen made of a plurality of flat display panels | [2004/05] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un écran constitué d'une pluralité de panneaux d'affichage plats | [2004/05] |
Former [2000/14] | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines, aus einer Mehrzahl von flachen Anzeigetafeln gebildetes Bildschirms und Wärmeabfuhrvorrichtung für flache Anzeigetafeln | ||
Former [2000/14] | Method of manufacturing a screen made of a plurality of flat display panels and heat radiator mechanism for flat display panels | ||
Former [2000/14] | Procédé de fabrication d'un écran constitué d'une pluralité de panneaux d'affichage plats et dispositif radiateur de chaleur pour panneaux d'affichage plats | Examination procedure | 27.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/48] | 28.03.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 27.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.05.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.05.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0832904 ; | [A]JPH03160488 ; | [A]JPH04274141 ; | [A]US3828215 (BILSBACK M) [A] 1,3 * column 6, lines 50-55; figure 4 *; | [PX]WO9844531 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [PX] 1,3 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960628), vol. 1996, no. 06, & JP08032904 A 19960202 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD) [A] 1,3 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911009), vol. 015, no. 399, Database accession no. (P - 1261), & JP03160488 A 19910710 (TOSOH CORP) [A] 1,3 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930212), vol. 017, no. 071, Database accession no. (E - 1319), & JP04274141 A 19920930 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1,3 * abstract * |