Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2933616B | Global Dossier | 16.08.1999 | B2 | JPH11171639 | 29.06.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP21648198 | 14.07.1998 | JP29169497 | 07.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0972755 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2003 | B1 | EP0972755 | 19.01.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP21648198 | 14.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69909912T | 12.02.2004 | T2 | DE69909912D1 | 04.09.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP21648198 | 14.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6069105 | 30.05.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP21648198 | 14.07.1998 |