EP0972755 - Alumina-based sintered material and process for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.07.2004 [2004/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/03] | For all designated states NGK SPARK PLUG CO., LTD 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamoto, Yoshihiro c/o NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP | 02 /
Matsubara, Katsura c/o NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP | 03 /
Shimamori, Toru c/o NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP | 04 /
Itakura, Kazuhisa c/o NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP | 05 /
Mizuno, Ken-ichi c/o NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi / JP | [2000/03] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/03] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99106708.3 | 01.04.1999 | [2000/03] | Priority number, date | JP19980216481 | 14.07.1998 Original published format: JP 21648198 | [2000/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0972755 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0972755 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/111, H01B3/12 | [2000/03] | CPC: |
H01B3/12 (EP,US);
C04B35/111 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, SE [2000/39] |
Former [2000/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Sinterprodukt auf Basis von Aluminiumoxid und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [2000/03] | English: | Alumina-based sintered material and process for producing the same | [2000/03] | French: | Produit fritté à base d'alumine et son procédé de préparation | [2000/03] | Examination procedure | 15.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/03] | 22.11.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 17.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]JPS6144757 ; | [AD]JPS60151275 ; | [AD]JPS6021854 | [XD] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 86, no. 15, Database accession no. 86-098575, XP002115426 & JPS6144757 A 19860304 (TAIYO YUDEN KK) [XD] 1,2,4-10 * abstract * | [AD] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 85, no. 38, Database accession no. 85-233151, XP002115427 & JPS60151275 A 19850809 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO. LTD.) [AD] 1-10 * abstract * | [AD] - ., DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 85, no. 11, Database accession no. 85-065829, XP002115428 & JPS6021854 A 19850204 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC. IND. CO. LTD.) [AD] 1-10 * abstract * |