EP0947791 - Cryogenic argon production system with thermally integrated stripping column [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.09.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.11.2002 [2002/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRAXAIR TECHNOLOGY, INC. 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury, CT 06810-5113 / US | [1999/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bonaquist, Dante, Patrick 1036 Ransom Road Grand Island, NY 14072 / US | 02 /
Lynch, Nancy, Jean 393 Wurlitzer Drive North Tonawanda, NY 14120 / US | 03 /
Roberts, Mark, Julian 135, 2nd Street Nazareth, PA 18064 / US | [1999/40] | Representative(s) | Schwan, Gerhard, et al Schwan Schwan Schorer Patentanwälte Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/40] | Schwan, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Elfenstrasse 32 81739 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99106709.1 | 01.04.1999 | [1999/40] | Priority number, date | US19980053751 | 02.04.1998 Original published format: US 53751 | [1999/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0947791 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0947791 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | [1999/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F25J3/04 | [1999/40] | CPC: |
F25J3/04412 (EP,US);
F25J3/04 (KR);
F25J3/04709 (EP,US);
F25J2200/54 (EP,US);
F25J2205/02 (EP,US);
F25J2250/20 (EP,US);
Y10S62/924 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/35] |
Former [1999/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kryogenisches System zur Herstellung von Argon mit einer thermisch integrierten Strippingkolonne | [1999/40] | English: | Cryogenic argon production system with thermally integrated stripping column | [1999/40] | French: | Système cryogénique pour la production d'argon avec une colonne de strippage thermiquement integrée | [1999/40] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/11] | 27.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/46] | 10.06.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0538520 (OD I NIZKOTEMPERATURNOI TEKHN [SU], et al) [X] 1,5 * column 8, line 25 - line 37; figure -; claim - * [A] 2-4,6-8; | [A]US5682765 (LYNCH NANCY JEAN [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 5, line 7 - line 29; figure -; claim - *; | [A]FR2705141 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR], et al) [A] 1-8 * page 3, line 27 - page 4, line 5; figure -; claim - *; | [A]US5049174 (THOROGOOD ROBERT M [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 5, line 47 - line 50; figure -; claim - * * column 6, line 10 - line 29 * |