EP0950598 - Orientation device using satellites [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2001 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.03.2001 [2001/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Bahn Aktiengesellschaft Ruschestrasse 59 10365 Berlin / DE | [1999/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klier, Franz Moorweg 11 85296 Rohrbach / DE | 02 /
Kuhla, Eckhard Hörholzweg 9 a 82205 Gilching / DE | [1999/42] | Application number, filing date | 99106902.2 | 08.04.1999 | [1999/42] | Priority number, date | DE1998116435 | 15.04.1998 Original published format: DE 19816435 | [1999/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0950598 | Date: | 20.10.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B61L25/02, G01S5/00, G01S5/14 | [1999/42] | CPC: |
G01S5/0027 (EP);
B61L25/025 (EP);
G01S19/14 (EP);
G01S19/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2000/26] |
Former [1999/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Satellitenortungsvorrichtung | [1999/42] | English: | Orientation device using satellites | [1999/42] | French: | Dispositif de localisation par satellites | [1999/42] | Examination procedure | 21.04.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/11] | 15.09.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE4439768 (TELIA AB [SE]) [Y] 1,2 * page 1, line 3 - page 3, line 37 *; | [A]WO9609941 (TRIMBLE NAVIGATION [US]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 2 - line 31 *; | [Y]DE29606577U (RUHRKOHLE AG [DE]) [Y] 1,2 * page 1, line 6 - page 6, column 25 *; | [A]EP0748727 (SEGURMAP SA [ES]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19544158 (NESKOM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [PA]DE19647461 (DEUTSCHE BAHN AG [DE]) [PA] 1* the whole document * |