EP1059279 - Polyvinyl ether compound and method of preperation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.2006 [2006/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IDEMITSU KOSAN CO., LTD. 1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8321 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/33] | For all designated states IDEMITSU KOSAN CO., LTD. 1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8321 / JP | ||
Former [2000/50] | For all designated states IDEMITSU KOSAN CO., LTD. 1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Egawa, Tatsuya c/o Idemitsu Kosan Co., Ltd. 1280, Kamiizumi Sodegaura-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 02 /
Kawaguchi, Yasuhiro c/o Idemitsu Kosan Co., Ltd. 1280, Kamiizumi Sodegaura-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 03 /
Mogami, Kenji, c/o Idemitsu Kosan Co., Ltd. 1280, Kamiizumi Sodegaura-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 04 /
Shimizu, Nobuaki, c/o Idemitsu Kosan Co., Ltd. 1280, Kamiizumi Sodegaura-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | [2000/50] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 99106903.0 | 25.05.1993 | [2000/50] | Priority number, date | JP19920143922 | 04.06.1992 Original published format: JP 14392292 | JP19920237842 | 07.09.1992 Original published format: JP 23784292 | [2000/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1059279 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1059279 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07C41/28, C07C43/04, C07C43/10, C07C43/11, C07C43/15, C08F8/04, C08F16/18, C08F299/02, C10M107/24, C07C43/315 | [2000/50] | CPC: |
C07C41/28 (EP,KR,US);
C07C41/54 (EP,US);
C07C43/10 (EP,US);
C07C43/11 (EP,US);
C07C43/15 (EP,US);
C07C43/315 (EP,US);
C08F16/18 (EP,US);
C10M107/24 (EP,US);
C10M171/008 (EP,US);
C10M2209/04 (EP,US);
C10M2209/06 (EP,US);
C10M2209/062 (EP,US);
C10M2211/022 (EP,US);
C10M2211/06 (EP,US);
C10N2040/00 (EP,US);
C10N2040/30 (EP,US);
C10N2040/32 (EP,US);
C10N2040/34 (EP,US);
C10N2040/36 (EP,US);
C10N2040/38 (EP,US);
C10N2040/40 (EP,US);
C10N2040/42 (EP,US);
C10N2040/44 (EP,US);
C10N2040/50 (EP,US);
Y10S525/94 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C41/28, C07C43/04 (US,EP);
C07C41/28, C07C43/06 (EP,US);
C07C41/28, C07C43/10 (US,EP);
C07C41/28, C07C43/11 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/50] | Title | German: | Polyvinyletherverbindung und Herstellungsverfahren | [2000/50] | English: | Polyvinyl ether compound and method of preperation | [2000/50] | French: | Composé d'éther polyvinylique et procédé de préparation | [2000/50] | Examination procedure | 06.10.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: divisional application deemed not to have been filed | 20.10.1999 | Request for decision received: (all rights) | 27.10.2000 | Result of request for decision ((all rights)): Request accepted | 17.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/29] | 04.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93910387.5 / EP0644175 | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 17.08.2005 | LI | 17.08.2005 | NL | 17.08.2005 | SE | 17.11.2005 | PT | 17.01.2006 | [2006/25] |
Former [2006/14] | CH | 17.08.2005 | |
LI | 17.08.2005 | ||
NL | 17.08.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | SE | 17.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2165962 (MARTIN MUELLER-CUNRADI, et al) [X] 1,2,5-9 * the whole document *; | [X]US2487525 (J. W. COPENHAVER) [X] 1,2,5-9 * the whole document *; | [X]US2590598 (COPENHAVER JOHN W) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [X]US3121120 (A. E. MONTAGNA) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [X]DE1231678 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG) [X] 10,11 * example 1 *; | [X]GB1500020 (HOECHST AG) [X] 10,11 * example -; claim - *; | [X]GB1581412 (TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORP) [X] 10,11,13 * claim - *; | [X]US4482753 (HUANG TAI-NANG [US], et al) [X] 10,11 * the whole document *; | [X] - W. L. HOWARD ET AL, "Hydrogenolysis of ketals", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, EASTON US, vol. 26, pages 1026 - 1028, XP002108539 [X] 10,11,13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo01063a010 |