EP0953566 - Selective transformation of pyridines with electrophiles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.2003 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [1999/44] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gypser, Andreas, Dr. B 4.4 68159 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
Sauter, Hubert, Dr. Neckarpromenade 20 68167 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
Ptock, Arne, Dr. Eichenstrasse 23 67067 Ludwigshafen / DE | 04 /
Stürmer, Rainer, Dr. Hauptstrasse 153 67127 Rödersheim-Gronau / DE | 05 /
Grammenos, Wassilios, Dr. Borsigstrasse 5 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [1999/44] | Application number, filing date | 99106914.7 | 08.04.1999 | [1999/44] | Priority number, date | DE1998118681 | 27.04.1998 Original published format: DE 19818681 | [1999/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0953566 | Date: | 03.11.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0953566 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | [2001/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/64, C07D213/75, C07D213/61 | [2001/16] | CPC: |
C07D213/64 (EP);
C07D213/643 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/44] | C07D213/127, C07D213/64 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2002/03] |
Former [1999/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Selektive Umsetzung von Pyridinen mit Elektrophilen | [1999/44] | English: | Selective transformation of pyridines with electrophiles | [1999/44] | French: | Transformation selective de pyridines avec des electrophiles | [1999/44] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/21] | 14.03.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0316185 (DOW CHEMICAL CO) [X] 6 * page 6; example D *; | [XA] - COMINS, DANIEL L. ET AL, "Lithiation of methoxypyridines directed by.alpha.-amino alkoxides", J. ORG. CHEM. (1990), 55(1), 69-73, XP000983657 [X] 6,7 * page 70 * [A] 1-5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00288a014 | [X] - WEGLINSKI ET AL., "Preparation and some reactoins of 2-phenoxy-6-methyl- and 6-phenoxy-5-methylnicotinic acids", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19940103), vol. 120, no. 1, Database accession no. 8485, XP002161096 [X] 6 * abstract * | [ ] - PR. NAUK. AKAD. EKON. IM OSKARA LANGEGO WROCLAWIU, (1992), vol. 626, pages 183 - 192 | [X] - SANO ET AL., "Dioxopyrolines. XLIV. thermal 1,3-shift of ...", CHEM. PHARM. BULL., (1990), vol. 38, no. 1, pages 36 - 44, XP002161094 [X] 6 * see page 37, compound 8 * | [A] - MARSAIS F ET AL, "REGIOSELECTIV SYNTHESIS AND APPLICATIONS OF AN ALPHA-BROMO-PYRIDINECARBANION OPENING OF THE PYRIDINE RING RESULTING FROM NUCLEOPHILIC ATTACK", JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL RESEARCH. SYNOPSES,GB,LONDON, (19821001), no. 10, ISSN 0308-2342, pages 278 - 279, XP000567421 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * | [A] - PLE N ET AL, "METALATION OF DIAZINES VIII METALATION OF 4-CHLOROPYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVES NEW SYNTHESIS OF TRIMETHOPRIM", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS,NL,ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, (19930305), vol. 34, no. 10, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 1605 - 1608, XP000562685 [A] 1-5 * page 1606 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-4039(93)85019-S | [T] - POLLET ET AL., "Synthesis of chiral diazine and pyridine sulfoxides...", J.ORG.CHEM., (19990518), vol. 64, pages 4512 - 4515, XP002161095 [T] 1-5 * page 4513 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo981125d |