EP0951849 - Seat suspended to a wall holder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.06.2005 [2005/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EISEN- UND DRAHTWERK ERLAU AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Erlau 16 D-73431 Aalen / DE | [1999/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Speich, Helmut Filderweg 26 73460 Hüttlingen / DE | [1999/43] | Representative(s) | Jackisch-Kohl, Anna-Katharina Patentanwälte Jackisch-Kohl & Kohl Stuttgarter Strasse 115 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/43] | Jackisch-Kohl, Anna-Katharina Patentanwälte Jackisch-Kohl & Kohl Stuttgarter Strasse 115 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 99106977.4 | 09.04.1999 | [1999/43] | Priority number, date | DE1998207383U | 23.04.1998 Original published format: DE 29807383 U | DE1998213283U | 25.07.1998 Original published format: DE 29813283 U | [1999/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0951849 | Date: | 27.10.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0951849 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | [2001/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0951849 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A47C9/06 | [1999/43] | CPC: |
A47C9/06 (EP);
A47K3/282 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, GB, IT, NL [2001/50] |
Former [1999/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Einhängesitz zum Einhängen in einen Wandhalter | [1999/43] | English: | Seat suspended to a wall holder | [1999/43] | French: | Siège suspendu à un support fixé à une paroi | [1999/43] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/35] | 10.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]JP2000126063 ; | [XA]DE3413245 (KOEHLER GERHARD) [X] 1,2,8-14,17,18 * figure .; claim - * [A] 3-7,15,16,19,20; | [X]EP0402284 (INTERGENERATION POUR L EMPLOI [FR]) [X] 1,3 * figure 1; claim 6 *; | [A]DE9409686U (HILLERKUS KARL WILHELM [DE]) [A] 1-20 * figure -; claim . *; | [A]US5467486 (GUENTHER TORBETT B [US]) [A] 1,8 * page 4; figures 2,3 * | [E] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001006), vol. 2000, no. 08, & JP2000126063 A 20000509 (SEIKO IRYOKI SEISAKUSHO:KK) [E] 1 * abstract * |