EP0958949 - Lateral connector for antiskid chain [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PEWAG AUSTRIA GmbH Theodor-Körner-Strasse 59 8010 Graz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/22] | For all designated states PEWAG AUSTRIA GmbH Theodor-Körner-Strasse 59 A-8010 Graz / AT | ||
Former [2002/30] | For all designated states Pewag Contiweiss Deutschland GmbH Einsteinstrasse 34 59423 Unna / DE | ||
Former [1999/47] | For all designated states CONTIWEISS WEISSENFELS GMBH & CO. KG Einssteinstrasse 34 59423 Unna / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Franklin, Charles R. Verdi No. 5 33010 Fusine in Valromana (Tarvisio) / IT | [1999/47] | Representative(s) | Geyer, Werner, et al Geyer, Fehners & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Perhamerstrasse 31 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/05] | Geyer, Werner, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Geyer, Fehners & Partner Perhamerstrasse 31 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/47] | Geyer, Werner, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwälte Geyer, Fehners & Partner Perhamerstrasse 31 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99107187.9 | 13.04.1999 | [1999/47] | Priority number, date | DE1998123075 | 22.05.1998 Original published format: DE 19823075 | [1999/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0958949 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0958949 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | [2002/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0958949 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60C27/10 | [1999/47] | CPC: |
B60C27/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, IT [2003/23] |
Former [1999/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Seitenhalterung einer Gleitschutzkette | [1999/47] | English: | Lateral connector for antiskid chain | [1999/47] | French: | Connection latérale pour chaîne anti-patinage | [1999/47] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/14] | 18.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02012467.3 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 12.07.2002 | Opposition(s) | 29.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.06.2001 | 30.04.2002 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   12.06.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 28.01.2004 | AT | 13.04.2004 | [2006/14] |
Former [2005/51] | AT | 13.04.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1521619 (HAAS, P.) [A] 1,3 * figures 1,3,5,8 * * page 2, column 2, line 66 * * page 2, column 2, lines 74-76 * * page 2, column 2, lines 87-110 *; | [A]CH352918 (VENOGE S A [CH]) [A] 1,3* the whole document *; | [A]DE8704523U (KÖNIG S.P.A. , MOLTENO, IT) [A] 1,10 * page 4, paragraph 4 * * claim 3 * * claim 1 * * figures 1,2 * |