EP0951940 - Magnetic separation using hot separator high-strength magnets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.02.2001 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.04.2001 [2001/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc. 601 Jefferson Avenue Houston Texas 77002-7990 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/43] | For all designated states Kellogg Brown & Root, Inc. 601 Jefferson Avenue Houston, Texas 77002-7990 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goolsby, Terry L. 20914 Medallion Pointe Drive Katy, Texas, 77450 / US | 02 /
Kowalczyk, Dennis C. 5153 Bronwyn Court Gibsonia, Pennsylvania, 15044 / US | [1999/43] | Representative(s) | Weiss, Wolfgang, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/43] | Weiss, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Chem. Dr., et al Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99107198.6 | 13.04.1999 | [1999/43] | Priority number, date | US19980065765 | 24.04.1998 Original published format: US 65765 | [1999/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0951940 | Date: | 27.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0951940 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | [2000/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B03C1/18, C10G11/18 | [1999/43] | CPC: |
C10G11/182 (EP);
B03C1/02 (KR);
B03C1/18 (EP);
Y02P70/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/42] |
Former [1999/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Magnettrennung mit heisse Starkfeld-Magneten | [1999/43] | English: | Magnetic separation using hot separator high-strength magnets | [1999/43] | French: | Séparation magnétique utilisant des aimants à champ fort à température élevée | [1999/43] | Examination procedure | 10.08.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/15] | 16.11.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]US5198098 (HETTINGER WILLIAM P [US]) [DY] 1,2,7 * figure 3; example 4; claims 1,14 *; | [A]EP0396463 (FIVES CAIL BABCOCK [FR]) [A] 1,2,6,7,11 * column 2, line 37 - line 54; figure 2; claim 1 * | [Y] - J.SVOBODA, Magnetic Methods for the Treatment of Minerals, AMSTERDAM NL, ELSEVIER, (1987), XP002125952 [Y] 1,2,7 * page 68 - page 77, paragraph 2 * |