blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0979744

EP0979744 - Automotive air conditioning device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.01.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.02.2003  [2003/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Calsonic Kansei Corporation
24-15, Minami-dai 5-chome, Nakano-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/03]For all designated states
Calsonic Kansei Corporation
24-15, Minamidai 5-chome, Nakano-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
Calsonic Corporation
24-15, Minamidai 5-chome, Nakano-ku
Tokyo 164-8602 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tsuihiji, Yoshinobu
c/o Calsonic Corporation, 24-15 Minamidai 5-chome
Nakano-ku, Tokyo 164-8602 / JP
02 / Endo, Mitsuru
c/o Calsonic Corporation, 24-15 Minamidai 5-chome
Nakano-ku, Tokyo 164-8602 / JP
03 / Inaba, Yoshiaki
c/o Calsonic Corporation, 24-15 Minamidai 5-chome
Nakano-ku, Tokyo 164-8602 / JP
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99107466.729.04.1999
[2000/07]
Priority number, dateJP1998022625210.08.1998         Original published format: JP 22625298
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979744
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0979744
Date:27.02.2002
Language:EN
[2002/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:B60H1/00
[2000/07]
CPC:
B60H1/00842 (EP,US); B60H1/00857 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/43]
Former [2000/07]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Fahrzeugklimaanlage[2000/07]
English:Automotive air conditioning device[2000/07]
French:Dispositif de climatisation pour véhicule[2000/07]
Examination procedure29.04.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
24.04.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.09.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.12.2001Fee for grant paid
06.12.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.11.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS61146615  ;
 [A]JPS61105207  ;
 [A]DE3526518  (PORSCHE AG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 12, line 6 - column 17, line 25; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]DE19757280  (DENSO CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * column 8, line 30 - column 13, line 25; figure 3 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861121), vol. 010, no. 346, Database accession no. (M - 537), & JP61146615 A 19860704 (NIPPON DENSO CO LTD) [A] * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860927), vol. 010, no. 286, Database accession no. (M - 521), & JP61105207 A 19860523 (NIPPON DENSO CO LTD) [A] * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.