blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0969236

EP0969236 - Kink resistant high pressure hose [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  04.06.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.06.2004Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 21.07.2004  [2004/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Parker Hannifin GmbH
An der Tuchbleiche 4
68623 Lampertheim / DE
[2000/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Kleinert, Helmut
Alfred-Delp-Strasse 11
68623 Lampertheim / DE
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Schmid, Rudolf
Patentanwalt
Ketteler Strasse 18
55270 Zornheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Schmid, Rudolf, Dipl.-Ing., Patentanwalt
Seckenheimer Strasse 36a
68165 Mannheim / DE
Application number, filing date99107515.115.04.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateUS19980090995P29.06.1998         Original published format: US 90995 P
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969236
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0969236
Date:02.01.2002
[2002/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.11.2001
ClassificationIPC:F16L11/08
[2000/01]
CPC:
C03B37/026 (EP); C03B37/027 (EP); C03C25/1063 (EP);
C03C25/42 (EP); C03C25/46 (EP); C03C25/52 (EP);
F16L11/08 (EP); C03B2201/58 (EP); C03B2203/10 (EP);
C03B2203/36 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/01]
TitleGerman:Knickbeständiger Hochdruckschlauch[2000/01]
English:Kink resistant high pressure hose[2000/01]
French:Tube flexible à haute pression résistant au tortillement[2000/01]
Examination procedure28.12.2001Examination requested  [2002/10]
25.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.02.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.03.2004Fee for grant paid
14.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.04.2004Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
16.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
22.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0032352  (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [A] 1,18 * abstract *;
 [A]US4553568  (PICCOLI DANTE E [US], et al) [A] 1,18 * figures 1-5; claims 1-9 *;
 [A]FR1583167  (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE) [A] 1,18 * page 2, column 1, line 17 - page 3, column 2, line 32; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]FR2398954  (DUNLOP LTD [GB]) [A] 1,18 * figures 1-5; claims 1-15 *;
 [A]US3604461  (MATTHEWS RICHARD A) [A] 1 * figures 1-6; claims 1-11 *;
 [A]US1281557  (GOODALL HOWARD W [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantUS3116760
 US3159183
 US3966238
 US4952262
 US4384595
 US4537222
 US4317000
 US3791415
 US4175992
 US4241763
 US4585035
 US5024252
 US4444707
 US3805848
 US3790419
 US3566924
 US5361806
 US3564967
 US4259991
 US4850395
 US3905398
 US5062456
 US4898212
 US4699178
 US4343333
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.