EP0950932 - Timepiece with one of the displays extending along an arc of a circle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daniel Roth et Gérald Genta Haute Horlogerie SA 42, chemin du Grand-Puits, Case Postale 382 1217 Meyrin 1 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2004/05] | For all designated states Daniel Roth et Gerald Genta Haute Horlogerie SA 42, chemin du Grand-Puits, Case Postale 382 1217 Meyrin 1 / CH | ||
Former [1999/42] | For all designated states Daniel Roth S.A. Rue de la Gare 4 1347 Le Sentier / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roth, Daniel Rue de l'Arcadie 43 1347 Le Sentier / CH | [1999/42] | Representative(s) | Moinas, Michel, et al Moinas & Savoye S.A. Rue Plantamour 42 1201 Genève / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Moinas, Michel, et al Moinas & Savoye S.A. Rue Plantamour 42 1201 Genève / CH | ||
Former [2001/06] | Moinas, Michel, et al MOINAS SAVOYE & CRONIN, 42 rue Plantamour 1201 Genève / CH | ||
Former [1999/42] | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al I C B, Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA, 7, rue des Sors 2074 Marin / CH | Application number, filing date | 99107541.7 | 15.04.1999 | [1999/42] | Priority number, date | EP19980106985 | 17.04.1998 Original published format: EP 98106985 | [1999/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0950932 | Date: | 20.10.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0950932 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G04B19/08 | [1999/42] | CPC: |
G04B19/082 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2000/26] |
Former [1999/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Zeitmesser,dessen eine Anzeige sich über einen Kreissektor erstreckt | [1999/42] | English: | Timepiece with one of the displays extending along an arc of a circle | [1999/42] | French: | Garde-temps dont un des affichages s'étend sur un arc de cercle | [1999/42] | Examination procedure | 20.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/25] | 25.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2002 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.07.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CH165551 (STROUN FRERES SOCIETE ANONYME [CH]) [X] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2667406 (TUNG HUANG CHANG) [X] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0788036 (GERALD GENTA S A [CH]) [A] 1,2,7 * the whole document *; | [A]FR647409 (ETABLISSEMENTS LANCEL SOC D) [A] 3 * page 1, line 47 - page 2, line 14 * | by applicant | DE29607071U | CH33813 |