EP0956993 - Process and system for cruise control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.02.2004 [2004/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [1999/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hahn, Stefan Ochsensteige 69 89075 Ulm/Donau / DE | 02 /
Kuhn, Friedemann Elsa-Brandström-Strasse 6 70736 Fellbach / DE | 03 /
Lorenz, Rudolf Hagenrain 10 73061 Ebersbach / DE | 04 /
Mezger, Klaus Dr. Pischekstrasse 15 70184 Stuttgart / DE | [1999/46] | Application number, filing date | 99107708.2 | 17.04.1999 | [1999/46] | Priority number, date | DE1998121803 | 15.05.1998 Original published format: DE 19821803 | [1999/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0956993 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0956993 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B60K31/00 | [1999/46] | CPC: |
B60K31/0058 (EP,US);
B60W30/146 (EP);
B60W2554/801 (EP,US);
B60W2556/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/30] |
Former [1999/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Längsgeschwindigkeitssteuerung eines Kraftfahrzeuges | [1999/46] | English: | Process and system for cruise control | [1999/46] | French: | Système et méthode de commande de vitesse | [1999/46] | Examination procedure | 17.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/46] | 31.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]DE19502954 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [DX] 1,3,4,7,10,12,13,16 * abstract * * column 1, line 59 - line 65 * * column 2, line 10 - line 55 *; | [DA]WO9317406 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1,10 * abstract * * page 2 - page 3 *; | [A] - HAMBERGER W ET AL, "NAVIGATIONSSYSTEME ALS DATENBASIS FUER EIN ADAPTIVES ANTRIEBSMANAGEMENT", ATZ AUTOMOBILTECHNISCHE ZEITSCHRIFT, (19960401), vol. 98, no. 4, ISSN 0001-2785, pages 218 - 222, XP000582532 [A] 1,10 | by applicant | WO8805199 | DE4201142 | DE19502954 | WO9317406 | DE19506364 | DE3438385 | EP0188455 | DE3308803 | DE3817495 |