blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0953609

EP0953609 - Pigment derivatives for waterborne coatings [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  22.02.2002
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2002Refusal of applicationpublished on 10.04.2002  [2002/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BAYER CORPORATION
100 Bayer Road
Pittsburgh, PA 15205 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/44]For all designated states
Bayer Corporation
100 Bayer Road
Pittsburgh, PA 15205 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Badejo, Ibraheem T.
103 Gambardelli Court
Morrisville, NC 27560 / US
02 / Rice, Daphne J.
507 Stinson Drive, Apt. A-9
Charleston, SC 29407 / US
[1999/44]
Representative(s)Herbold, Matthias, et al
Bayer AG
Konzernbereich RP, Patente und Lizenzen
D-51368 Leverkusen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/44]Herbold, Matthias Dr., et al
Bayer AG Konzernbereich RP, Patente und Lizenzen
D-51368 Leverkusen / DE
Application number, filing date99107727.219.04.1999
[1999/44]
Priority number, dateUS1998007097001.05.1998         Original published format: US 70970
[1999/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0953609
Date:03.11.1999
Language:EN
[1999/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0953609
Date:23.02.2000
[2000/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.01.2000
ClassificationIPC:C09B67/22, C09B48/00, C09D5/00
[1999/44]
CPC:
C09B48/00 (EP,US); C09B67/0034 (EP,US); C09D7/41 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [2000/44]
Former [1999/44]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Pigmentderivaten für wässrige Beschichtungszusammensetzungen[1999/44]
English:Pigment derivatives for waterborne coatings[1999/44]
French:Dérivés de pigments pour compositions de revêtement aqueuses[1999/44]
Examination procedure23.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/42]
11.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.03.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.10.2001Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/15]
10.10.2001Date of oral proceedings
26.10.2001Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
02.11.2001Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2002/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]GB2071683  (TOYO INK MFG CO) [Y] 1-11 * page 1, line 48 - line L; example - *;
 [D]US4310359  (EHASHI SHIGEYUKI, et al);
 [YP]EP0848043  (DAINICHISEIKA COLOR CHEM [JP]) [YP] 1-11 * abstract * * page 12, line 39 - page 13, line 15 *;
 [Y]EP0360182  (HOECHST AG [DE]) [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * page 6, line 32 - line 36 *;
 [A]EP0362690  (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [D]US5368641  (DIETZ ERWIN [DE], et al);
 [A]US4172202  (PAPENFUHS THEODOR [DE]) [A] 1 * examples 13,18 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.