EP0953910 - Method and apparatus for controlling write access to storage means for a digital data processing circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.01.2012 [2012/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2008/17] | For all designated states THOMSON Licensing 46, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2008/16] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing, S.A. 46, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states THOMSON 46, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [1999/44] | For all designated states DEUTSCHE THOMSON-BRANDT GMBH Hermann-Schwer-Strasse 3 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Adolph, Dirk Wallbrink 2 30952 Ronnenberg / DE | 02 /
Schiller, Harald Apfelgarten 11 30539 Hannover / DE | [1999/44] | Representative(s) | Hartnack, Wolfgang Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/44] | Hartnack, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH Licensing & Intellectual Property, Karl-Wiechert-Alee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 99107745.4 | 19.04.1999 | [1999/44] | Priority number, date | EP19980250147 | 30.04.1998 Original published format: EP 98250147 | [1999/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0953910 | Date: | 03.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0953910 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | [2006/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0953910 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/00 | [1999/44] | CPC: |
G06F21/567 (EP);
G06F11/004 (EP);
G06F12/1433 (EP);
G06F9/30098 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/38] |
Former [1999/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Überwachung der Schreibzugriffe zu einer Speichervorrichtung für eine digitale Datenverarbeitungsschaltung | [1999/44] | English: | Method and apparatus for controlling write access to storage means for a digital data processing circuit | [1999/44] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour controller l'accès d'écriture à des moyens de stockage pour un circuit de traitement de données numériques | [1999/44] | Examination procedure | 27.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/32] | 10.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 03.11.2010 | [2012/03] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9638775 (AST RESEARCH, INC.) [X] 1,4,5,8 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [X]US5421006 (JABLON ET AL.) [X] 1,4,5,8 * abstract *; | [A]GB2222899 (ANTHONY MORRIS ROSE) [A] 2,6 * page 8, line 20 - line 28 * |