EP0954076 - High performance telecommunication / data link with high density card edge with a tap and a contact displacement block [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2005 [2005/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KRONE GmbH Beeskowdamm 3-11 14167 Berlin / DE | For all designated states HAWORTH, INC. One Haworth Center 1400 Highway M-40 Holland, Michigan 49423 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/13] | For all designated states KRONE GmbH Beeskowdamm 3-11 14167 Berlin / DE | ||
For all designated states HAWORTH, INC. One Haworth Center 1400 Highway M-40 Holland Michigan 49423 / US | |||
Former [1999/50] | For all designated states KRONE Aktiengesellschaft Beeskowdamm 3-11 14167 Berlin / DE | ||
For all designated states HAWORTH, INC. One Haworth Center 1400 Highway M-40 Holland Michigan 49423 / US | |||
Former [1999/44] | For all designated states KRONE Aktiengesellschaft Beeskowdamm 3-11 14167 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Snow, Richard Herbert 20550 Way of Peace Deer Trail, CO 80105 / US | 02 /
Pickles, Timothy James 20593 E.Princeton Aurora, CO 80013 / US | 03 /
Johnson, Ross S. 1346 Bent Tree Court Hudsonville, Michigan / US | [1999/44] | Application number, filing date | 99107794.2 | 20.04.1999 | [1999/44] | Priority number, date | US19980067508 | 27.04.1998 Original published format: US 67508 | [1999/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0954076 | Date: | 03.11.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0954076 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | [2003/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/00, H01R24/18, H01R13/514 | [2003/35] | CPC: |
H02G3/00 (EP,US);
H01R9/24 (KR);
H01R13/28 (EP,US);
H01R24/84 (EP,US);
H01R43/24 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/44] | H02G3/00 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/33] |
Former [1999/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Hochleistungstelekommunikations-/Datenverbindung und -verbinder mit hoher Kontaktdichte mit Abgriff und Kontaktverdrängungsbaugruppe | [1999/44] | English: | High performance telecommunication / data link with high density card edge with a tap and a contact displacement block | [1999/44] | French: | Liaison haute performance de données et de télécommunication avec connecteur à haute densité avec prise et bloc de contact de déplacement | [1999/44] | Examination procedure | 20.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/09] | 13.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.06.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 25.06.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO9623339 (HAWORTH INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-6,15,16 * page 15 - page 52; figures 6-15 * [A] 10; | [Y]WO9747058 (BERG TECH INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-6,15,16 * figures 3,4 *; | [A]EP0215285 (ALLIED CORP [US]) [A] 1-6,15,16 * figure 2 *; | [DA]EP0809332 (KRONE AG [DE]) [DA] 1-6,15,16 * column 5, line 26 - column 13, line 3; figures 23-27 * |