EP0962243 - Filter medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 16.04.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2010 | Revocation of patent | published on 19.05.2010 [2010/20] | 16.04.2010 | New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MGF GUTSCHE & CO. GMBH-BETRIEBS-KG Hermann-Muth-Strasse 8 36039 Fulda / DE | [1999/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gutsche, Eugen Am Berg 51 36041 Fulda / DE | 02 /
Gutsche, Michael Lichtweg 7 36039 Fulda / DE | [1999/49] | Representative(s) | Müller, Eckhard, et al Mühlstrasse 9a 65597 Hünfelden-Dauborn / DE | [2008/44] |
Former [2006/04] | Müller, Eckhard, et al Dr. Müller & Partner Patentanwälte Mühlstrasse 9 a 65597 Hünfelden-Dauborn / DE | ||
Former [2004/05] | Hebing, Norbert, et al Patentanwälte Schlagwein + Hebing, Frankfurter Strasse 34 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | ||
Former [1999/49] | Schlagwein, Udo, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Frankfurter Strasse 34 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 99108022.7 | 23.04.1999 | [1999/49] | Priority number, date | DE19981020560 | 08.05.1998 Original published format: DE 19820560 | [1999/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0962243 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0962243 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B01D39/08, B01D39/14, B01D39/20 | [1999/49] | CPC: |
D04H13/00 (EP);
B01D39/16 (KR);
B01D39/086 (EP);
B01D39/1623 (EP);
B01D39/2017 (EP);
D03D15/267 (EP);
D04H1/43 (EP);
D04H1/4318 (EP);
D04H1/4342 (EP);
D04H1/48 (EP);
D04H1/482 (EP);
D04H5/02 (EP);
D04H5/12 (EP);
B01D2239/0622 (EP);
B01D2239/0627 (EP);
B01D2239/065 (EP);
B01D2239/0659 (EP);
B01D2239/0686 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/33] |
Former [1999/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | LT | 07.04.2000 | LV | 07.04.2000 | SI | 07.04.2000 | Title | German: | Filtermedium | [1999/49] | English: | Filter medium | [1999/49] | French: | Milieu filtrant | [1999/49] | Examination procedure | 07.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/23] | 09.06.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, GR, LU, MC | 31.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.07.2005
13.07.2005
ADMISSIBLE BWF Textil GmbH & Co. KG Bahnhofstr. 20 89362 Offingen / DE Opponent's representative Jehle, Volker Armin Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.07.2005
13.07.2005
ADMISSIBLE BWF Textil GmbH & Co. KG Bahnhofstr. 20 89362 Offingen / DE Opponent's representative Jehle, Volker Armin Patentanwälte Bosch, Graf von Stosch, Jehle, Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 10.08.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.02.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.01.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.04.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 02.04.2007 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 01.10.2009 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2010/20] | 01.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 01.06.2007 | Appeal received No. T0938/07 | 09.08.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 01.10.2009 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 01.10.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.10.2009 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.07.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.07.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 06.10.2004 | IE | 06.10.2004 | DK | 06.01.2005 | SE | 06.01.2005 | ES | 17.01.2005 | PT | 06.03.2005 | BE | 30.04.2005 | CH | 30.04.2005 | LI | 30.04.2005 | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/18] | FI | 06.10.2004 | |
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
SE | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
CH | 30.04.2005 | ||
LI | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 06.10.2004 | |
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
CH | 30.04.2005 | ||
LI | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 06.10.2004 | |
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
CH | 30.04.2005 | ||
LI | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 06.10.2004 | |
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | FI | 06.10.2004 | |
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 06.10.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3937860 (GUSMAN IRWIN J, et al) [A] 1 * claims 1,2,4 *; | [A]DE3029752 (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]) [A] 1-3 * claims 1-4 *; | [A]US4270933 (MENY ALLAN H, et al) [A] 1,2,4 * column 1, line 22 - line 39; claim 1 *; | [AD]FR2584942 (DOLLFUS NOACK SA [FR]) [AD] 1,6,7 * examples 4,5; claims 1,2,5-10 *; | [A]EP0358222 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]EP0801969 (MGF GUTSCHE & CO GMBH BETRIEBS [DE]) [A] 1,6,7 * the whole document *; | [D]DE19615022 (MGF GUTSCHE & CO GMBH BETRIEBS [DE]) |