EP0956966 - Sublimating card printing apparatus and sublimating card printing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.2008 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/39] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1999/46] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsuzaka, Hideki c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1999/46] | Representative(s) | Körber, Wolfhart, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patentanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Körber, Wolfhart, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patentanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/46] | Körber, Wolfhart, Dr., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99108153.0 | 26.04.1999 | [1999/46] | Priority number, date | JP19980132641 | 27.04.1998 Original published format: JP 13264198 | [1999/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0956966 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0956966 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | [2002/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0956966 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/32, G06K1/12, G06K13/077, G06K17/00 | [2002/19] | CPC: |
G06K19/07716 (EP,US);
B41F19/00 (KR);
B41J2/32 (EP,US);
B41J2202/35 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/46] | B41J2/32 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2003/05] |
Former [1999/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Sublimationskartendruckgerät und Sublimationskartendruckverfahren | [1999/46] | English: | Sublimating card printing apparatus and sublimating card printing method | [1999/46] | French: | Appareil et méthode d'impression de cartes par sublimation | [1999/46] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/46] | 01.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4827425 (LINDEN LAWRENCE F [US]) [X] 1-3,9 * column 1, line 36 - column 2, line 11; figures 1-3,5 * * column 2, lines 36-61 *; | [X]DE19641892 (ODS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-4,9 * column 2, line 40 - column 4, line 16; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US5378884 (LUNDSTROM ROBERT W [US], et al) [X] 1,9 * column 1, lines 35-53 * * column 3, lines 26-68; figure 1 *; | [A]US5426283 (BERTHOZAT MICHEL [FR], et al) [A] 1,9 * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 34; figure 6 * |