blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0970663

EP0970663 - Master/slave system for the manipulation of tubular medical tools [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.06.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.08.2003  [2003/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Meglan, Dwight Allan
of 6 Hutchins Circle
Lynnfield, MA 01940 / US
02 / Morgan, Frederick Marshall
of 157 Butler Road
Quincy, MA 02169 / US
03 / Wendlandt, Jeffrey Michael
of 20 Chauncy Street No. 2
Cambridge, MA 02138 / US
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 11a
80339 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner
Mozartstrasse 17
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date99108416.129.04.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateUS1998011299810.07.1998         Original published format: US 112998
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970663
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.10.1999
ClassificationIPC:A61B19/00
[2000/02]
CPC:
A61B34/75 (EP,US); A61B34/70 (EP,US); A61B34/74 (EP,US);
A61B34/76 (EP,US); A61B34/77 (EP,US); A61B2034/301 (EP,US);
A61M25/0105 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:Master/Slave System für die Steuerung von röhrenförmigen medizinischen Instrumenten[2000/02]
English:Master/slave system for the manipulation of tubular medical tools[2000/02]
French:Système maître/esclave pour la manipulation des instruments médicaux tubulaires[2000/02]
Examination procedure17.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/20]
28.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/33]
14.03.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2003/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE4213426  (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1 * column 30, line 23 - line 46; figures 54,55 *;
 [A]EP0683016  (D T I DR TRIPPE INGENIEURGES M [DE]) [A] 1,6 * column 5, line 3 - line 7; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5624398  (SMITH KEVIN W [US], et al) [A] 1,2,6,9 * column 18, line 49 - line 51; figure 34 * * column 20, line 14 - line 20 *;
 [XA]EP0776738  (STANFORD RES INST INT [US]) [X] 1,2,4 * column 10, line 50 - line 53 * * column 11, line 10 - column 12, line 1; figures 10,11 * * column 14, line 9 - line 26 * [A] 3,5,7;
 [A]WO9743943  (INTUITIVE SURGICAL INC [US]) [A] 1,2,4 * page 9, line 22 - page 10, line 3; figure 1 *;
 [A]  - SALCUDEAN S E ET AL, "TOWARDS A FORCE-REFLECTING MOTION-SCALING SYSTEM FOR MICROSURGERY", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ROBOTICS AND AUTOMAT, SAN DIEGO, MAY 8 - 13, 1994, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19940508), VOL 3, no. CONF. 11, ISBN 0-8186-5332-9, pages 2296 - 2301, XP000478610 [A] 1,2,4 * page 2297, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ROBOT.1994.350943
 [A]  - DARIO P ET AL, "ROBOTICS IN MEDICINE", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE/RSJ/GI INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INTELLIG ROBOTS AND SYSTEMS: ADVANCED ROBOTICS AND THE REAL WORLD, MUNICH, SEPT. 12 - 16, 1994, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19940912), vol. 2, ISBN 0-7803-1934-6, pages 739 - 752, XP000514573 [A] 1,6,9 * page 743, column L *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.