EP0957075 - Process for the preparation of 3,5,5-trimethylcyclohexa-3-ene-1-one (beta-isophorone) by isomerization of 3,5,5-trimethylcyclohexa-2-ene-1-one (alpha-isophorone) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.07.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2002 [2002/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa GmbH Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states Degussa AG Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1999/46] | For all designated states Degussa-Hüls Aktiengesellschaft 60287 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krill, Steffen Dr. Friedrich-Hölderlin-Weg 23 67346 Speyer / DE | 02 /
Kretz, Stephan Fr.-W.-von-Bauer-Strasse 1 63599 Biebergemünd / DE | 03 /
Hasselbach, Hans-Joachim Dr. Deutschordenstrasse 6 63571 Gelnhausen / DE | 04 /
Huthmacher, Klaus Dr. Lärchenweg 18 63584 Gelnhausen / DE | 05 /
Hahn, Rainer Dr. Schlossgasse 13 63654 Büdingen / DE | 06 /
Schmitt, Hermann Berliner Strasse 24 63517 Rodenbach / DE | [1999/46] | Application number, filing date | 99108497.1 | 30.04.1999 | [1999/46] | Priority number, date | DE1998121379 | 13.05.1998 Original published format: DE 19821379 | [1999/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0957075 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07C45/67, C07C45/82, C07C49/603 | [1999/46] | CPC: |
C07C45/67 (EP,US);
C07C45/82 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C45/67, C07C49/603 (EP,US);
C07C45/82, C07C49/603 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/30] |
Former [1999/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | SI | 30.04.1999 | Title | German: | Verbessertes Verfahren zur Herstellung von 3,5,5-Trimethylcyclohexa-3-en-1-on (Beta-Isophoron) durch Isomerisierung von 3,5,5-Trimethylcyclohexa-2-en-1-on (Alpha-Isophoron) (II) | [1999/46] | English: | Process for the preparation of 3,5,5-trimethylcyclohexa-3-ene-1-one (beta-isophorone) by isomerization of 3,5,5-trimethylcyclohexa-2-ene-1-one (alpha-isophorone) | [1999/46] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de 3,5,5-triméthylcyclohexa-3-ène-1-one (beta-isophorone) par isomérisation de 3,5,5-triméthylcyclohexa-2-ène-1-one (alpha-isophorone) | [1999/46] | Examination procedure | 30.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/46] | 07.12.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/05] | deleted | Deletion: Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/06] | 22.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/35] | 21.03.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2246032 (BENT FRANKLIN A) [Y] 1-4* page 3, column 1, line 37 - line 38; claim - *; | [Y]US3397120 (DIANA WILLIAM D, et al) [Y] 1-4 * column 7, line 66 - line 72; claim 1 *; | [X]FR2253730 (FIRMENICH & CIE [CH]) [X] 1-4,11 * page 5; claim 9 *; | [X]EP0832870 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-11 * the whole document * |