EP0955650 - Disengageable charging mechanism for spring powered electrical switching apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2003 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Corporation Eaton Center Cleveland Ohio 44114-2584 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/45] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION Eaton Center Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ulerich, Phillip Lloyd 57 Mallard Drive Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15238 / US | 02 /
Wehrli III, Henry Anthony 2453 Saunders Station Road Monroeville, Pennsylvania 15146 / US | 03 /
Brocklebank, William 2020 Main Street, Apt 8 Aliquippa, Pennsylvania 15001 / US | [1999/45] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/45] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing., et al WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99108542.4 | 05.05.1999 | [1999/45] | Priority number, date | US19980074052 | 07.05.1998 Original published format: US 74052 | [1999/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0955650 | Date: | 10.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0955650 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | [2000/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01H3/30 | [1999/45] | CPC: |
H01H3/3021 (EP,US);
H01H2003/3063 (EP,US);
H01H2003/3073 (EP,US);
H01H2003/3089 (EP,US);
H01H3/3015 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2001/10] |
Former [1999/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Entkuppelbarer Spannmechanismus für ein federgetriebenes Schaltgerät | [1999/45] | English: | Disengageable charging mechanism for spring powered electrical switching apparatus | [1999/45] | French: | Méchanisme de chargement débrayable pour un appareil de commutation électrique actioné par ressort | [1999/45] | Examination procedure | 05.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/05] | 14.02.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5004875 (MOODY G LAWRENCE [US], et al) [Y] 1,2 * column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 59; figures 1,2,9,9A,10,10A *; | [Y]US5224590 (MILIANOWICZ STANISLAW A [US], et al) [Y] 1,2 * column 15, line 46 - column 16, line 61; figures 20,23 *; | [Y]US5489755 (CASTONGUAY ROGER N [US], et al) [Y] 2,6,7 * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 3; figures 2,3 *; | [PY]US5883351 (CASTONGUAY ROGER N [US], et al) [PY] 1,2,6,7 * column 2, line 26 - line 42 ** column 4, line 33 - line 53; figures 3,5,6 * |