EP0955389 - Quality control for thermal spraying process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2010 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde AG Klosterhofstrasse 1 80331 München / DE | [2009/34] |
Former [2007/48] | For all designated states Linde Aktiengesellschaft Leopoldstrasse 252 80807 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states Linde AG Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2000/49] | For all designated states Linde Gas AG Seitnerstrasse 70 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | ||
Former [2000/14] | For all designated states Linde Technische Gase GmbH Seitnerstrasse 70 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | ||
Former [1999/45] | For all designated states Linde Aktiengesellschaft Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heinrich, Peter Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Pestalozzistrasse 5 82110 Germering / DE | 02 /
Krömmer, Werner Zeppelring 31 84034 Landshut / DE | 03 /
Landes, Klaus Prof. Dr. Melchiorstrasse 23 81479 München / DE | 04 /
Waas, Christopher Dipl.Ing. Theodor-Stern-Strasse 7 23795 Bad Segeberg / DE | 05 /
Zierhut, Jochen Dipl.-Ing. Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 14b 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | [1999/45] | Representative(s) | Obermüller, Bernhard, et al Linde Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/45] | Obermüller, Bernhard, et al Linde Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | Application number, filing date | 99108760.2 | 03.05.1999 | [1999/45] | Priority number, date | DE1998120195 | 06.05.1998 Original published format: DE 19820195 | [1999/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0955389 | Date: | 10.11.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0955389 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C23C4/12 | [1999/45] | CPC: |
C23C4/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [2000/29] |
Former [1999/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Qualitätsicherung beim thermischen Spritzen | [1999/45] | English: | Quality control for thermal spraying process | [1999/45] | French: | Contrôle de qualité pour un procédé de pulvérisation thermique | [1999/45] | Examination procedure | 22.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/51] | 02.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2002 | Observations by third parties | 17.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.03.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.03.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 26.08.2009 | ES | 07.12.2009 | GB | 03.05.2010 | [2011/35] |
Former [2011/28] | IT | 26.08.2009 | |
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 07.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19545005 (ABB PATENT GMBH) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 12 * * column 6, lines 16-46 *; | [A]DE19725404 (SEIDEL CHRISTIAN DR) [A] 1-10 * column 3, lines 44-56; figure 1 * | [Y] - GRANT P S ET AL, "The monitoring of deposit surface temperatures during spray-forming by infrared thermal-imaging", SCRIPTA METALLURGICA, OCT. 1989, USA, vol. 23, no. 10, ISSN 0036-9748, pages 1651 - 1656, XP002112983 [Y] 1-10 * page 1652 * * page 1654 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0036-9748(89)90337-2 | [Y] - MATIJASEVIC V C ET AL, "RHEED monitoring of rotating samples during large area homogeneous deposition of oxides", IN SITU PROCESS DIAGNOSTICS AND INTELLIGENT MATERIALS PROCESSING. SYMPOSIUM, IN SITU PROCESS DIAGNOSTICS AND INTELLIGENT MATERIALS PROCESSING. SYMPOSIUM, BOSTON, MA, USA, 2-5 DEC. 1997, 1998, Warrendale, PA, USA, Mater. Res. Soc, USA, ISBN 1-55899-407-6, pages 249 - 254, XP002112984 [Y] 1-10 * page 249, paragraph 1 * * page 251, paragraph 2 * | Examination | - LEHTINEN T. ET AL, "Correlations between in-flight particle concentrations and coating properties in atmospheric plasma spraying of alumina", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 9TH NATIONAL THERMAL SPRAY CONFERENCE (NTSC) IN CINCINNATI, USA, (19961007), pages 525 - 530 | - LEHTINEN T. ET AL, "Real-time optical spray pattern diagnostics for thermal spraying", PROCEEDINGS OF THE VII FINNISH CONFERENCE ON PHYSICS IN INDUSTRY,, TAMPERE, FINLAND, (19951101), page 105 | - LEHTINEN T. ET AL, "In-flight particle visualisation in thermal plasma spraying using an intensified CCD camera", PROCEEDINGS OF THE XXX ANNUAL CONFERENCE OF THE FINNISH PHYSICAL SOCIETY, OTANIEMI, ESPOO, FINLAND, (19960321), page 1.09 | - LEHTINEN T. ET AL, "Optical spray pattern diagnostics for thermal spraying", PROCEEDINGS OF THE OPTICS DAY '97, TAMPERE, FINLAND, (19970221), page 19 | - LEHTINEN T. ET AL, "In-flight particle concentration measurements in thermal plasma spraying using a CCD camera", PROCEEDINGS OF THE XXXI ANNUAL CONFERENCE OF THE FINNISH PHYSICAL SOCIETY, (19970313), page 10.23 | other | - LETHINEN T. ET AL, "REAL-TIME OPTICAL SPRAY PATERN DIAGNOSTICS FOR THERMAL SPRAYING", VII FINNISH CONFERENCE ON PHYSICS IN INDUSTRY, TAMPERE, FINLAND, (19951101), page 105, XP002954286 | - LETHINEN T. ET AL, "IN-FLIGHT PARTICLE VISUALISATION IN THERMAL PLASMA SPRAYING USING AN INTENSIFIED CCD CAMERA", PROCEEDINGS OF THE XXX ANNUAL CONFERENCE OF THE FINNISCH PHYSICAL SOCIETY, OTANIEMI, ESPOO, FINLAND, (19960321), page 1.09, XP002954287 | - LETHINEN T., "Correlations Between In-Flight Particle Concentrations and Coating Properties in Atmospheric Plasma Spraying of Alumina", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 9TH NATIONAL THERMAL SPRAY CONFERENCE (NTSC), CINCINNATI, USA, (19961007), pages 525 - 530, XP002954288 | - LETHINEN T. ET AL, "OPTICAL SPRAY PATTERN DIAGNOSTICS FOR THERMAL SPRAYING", OPTICS DAY '97 - PROCEEDINGS OF THE FINNISH OPTICAL SOCIETY, TAMPERE, FINLAND, (19970221), page 19, XP002954289 | - LETHINEN T. ET AL, "IN-FLIGHT PARTICLE CONCENTRATION MEASUREMENTS IN THERMAL PLASMA SPRAYING USING A CCD CAMERA", PROCEEDINGS OF THE XXXI ANNUAL CONFERENCE OF THE FINNISH PHYSICAL SOCIETY, HELSINKI, FINLAND, (19970313), page 10.23, XP002954290 |