blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0972811

EP0972811 - Radiation curable copolymer compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  08.12.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip06.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 09.12.2009  [2009/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wacker-Chemie GmbH
Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4
81737 München / DE
[2000/03]
Inventor(s)01 / Dauth, Jochen, Dr.
Lindenweg 1
84489 Burghausen / DE
02 / Weidner, Richard, Dr.
Rieser-Strasse 12
84489 Burghausen / DE
03 / Preiner, Gerhard, Dr.
Karl-Gros-Strasse 17
84489 Burghausen / DE
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Budczinski, Angelika, et al
Wacker Chemie AG
Zentralbereich Patente, Marken und Lizenzen
Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4
81737 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/50]Budczinski, Angelika, et al
Wacker Chemie AG Zentralbereich Patente, Marken und Lizenzen Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4
81737 München / DE
Former [2000/03]Budczinski, Angelika, et al
c/o Wacker-Chemie GmbH, Zentralabteilung PML, Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4
81737 München / DE
Application number, filing date99109378.202.06.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateDE199813202616.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19832026
[2000/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972811
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.09.1999
ClassificationIPC:C09D183/06, C09D183/14
[2000/03]
CPC:
C09D183/06 (EP); C09D183/14 (EP)
C-Set:
C09D183/06, C08L83/00 (EP);
C09D183/14, C08L83/00 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/39]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Strahlungshärtende, Copolymere enthaltende Zusammensetzungen[2000/03]
English:Radiation curable copolymer compositions[2000/03]
French:Compositions de copolymères durcissables par rayonnement[2000/03]
Examination procedure02.06.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
02.06.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
24.02.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
24.02.2000Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
01.08.2000Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2001/04]
11.08.2000Application refused, date of legal effect [2001/04]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9827174  (WOLFERSEDER JOSEF ;DAUTH JOCHEN (DE); ZOELLNER OLIVER (DE); HERZIG) [A] 1 * claims 1,4,7 * * page 11, line 9 - line 13 *;
 [A]WO9523694  (AVERY DENNISON CORP) [A] 1 * claims 1,5,6 *;
 [A]EP0624627  (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) [A] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0617094  (GOLDSCHMIDT AG TH) [A] 1 * claim 1 * * page 2, line 1 - line 3 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.