blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0938037

EP0938037 - An apparatus for manipulating an object displayed on a display device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.11.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.12.2004  [2004/53]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/02]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Former [1999/34]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Minakuchi, Yu, c/o Fujitsu Ltd.
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
02 / Okuyama, Satoshi c/o Fujitsu Ltd.
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
03 / Kamata, Hajime c/o Fujitsu Ltd.
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
04 / Fukue, Akiko
Igusa Green Hills 102, 6-20 Igusa 3-chome
Suginami-ku, Tokyo 167 / JP
[1999/34]
Representative(s)Stebbing, Timothy Charles, et al
Haseltine Lake LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/34]Stebbing, Timothy Charles, et al
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date99109484.807.10.1992
[1999/34]
Priority number, dateJP1991025823207.10.1991         Original published format: JP 25823291
[1999/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0938037
Date:25.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/34]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0938037
Date:22.03.2000
[2000/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0938037
Date:07.01.2004
Language:EN
[2004/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.02.2000
ClassificationIPC:G06F3/033
[1999/34]
CPC:
G06F3/0488 (EP,US); G06F3/03 (KR); G06F3/0481 (EP,US);
G06F3/04842 (EP,US); G06F3/04845 (EP,US); G06F3/0485 (EP,US);
G06F3/04883 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1999/34]
TitleGerman:Gerät zur Manipulation eines auf einem Bildschirm angezeigten Objektes[2003/13]
English:An apparatus for manipulating an object displayed on a display device[1999/34]
French:Appareil pour la manipulation d'un objet affiché sur une unité d'affichage[1999/34]
Former [1999/34]Gerät zur auf einem Anzeigeschirm angezeigten Manipulation eines Objektes
Examination procedure26.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/38]
30.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.03.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.07.2003Fee for grant paid
18.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP92117111.2  / EP0536715
Opposition(s)08.10.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/53]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
01.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
01.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
01.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
01.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
20.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
25.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 09
29.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 10
28.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 11
29.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 12
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0279652  (SENSOR FRAME INC [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 8, line 15 - line 24 ** column 8, line 50 - column 9, line 4 *;
 [X]EP0314395  (CROSFIELD ELECTRONICS LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 2 - line 30 * * column 5, line 6 - line 18 *;
 [A]EP0448496  (IBM [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 4 - line 15 * * column 4, line 17 - column 5, line 12 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.