EP0959521 - Wideband phased array antennas and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hughes Electronics Corporation 200 N. Sepulveda Boulevard El Segundo California 90245-0956 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/47] | For all designated states Hughes Electronics Corporation 200 N. Sepulveda Boulevard El Segundo, California 90245-0956 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Jar J. 24 Christamon East Irvine, CA 92620 / US | 02 /
Stephens, Ronald R. 3117 W. Sierra Drive Westlake Village, CA 91362 / US | 03 /
Wang, Harry T. 2626 Wordsworth Court Thousand Oaks, CA 91362 / US | [1999/47] | Representative(s) | Steil, Christian, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Steil, Christian, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1999/47] | Steil, Christian, Dipl.-Ing., et al Witte, Weller & Partner, Rotebühlstrasse 121 70178 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 99109502.7 | 12.05.1999 | [1999/47] | Priority number, date | US19980081672 | 19.05.1998 Original published format: US 81672 | [1999/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0959521 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0959521 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | [2000/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0959521 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q3/22 | [1999/47] | CPC: |
H01Q3/22 (EP,US);
H01Q25/008 (EP,US);
H01Q3/2676 (EP,US);
G01S13/426 (EP,US);
G01S2013/0245 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/36] |
Former [1999/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Breitband-phasengesteuerte Antenne und damit verbundenes Verfahren | [1999/47] | English: | Wideband phased array antennas and method | [1999/47] | French: | Réseaux d'antennes à commande de phase et à large bande et méthode associée | [1999/47] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/32] | 29.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3090928 (WELTY WILLIAM R) [A] 1-10 * column W *; | [E]US5933113 (NEWBERG IRWIN L [US], et al) [E] 1-10 * column W *; | [E]US5977911 (GREEN LEON [US], et al) [E] 1-10 * column W *; | [E]US5999128 (STEPHENS RONALD R [US], et al) [E] 1-10 * column W * |