blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0971098

EP0971098 - Engine with pneumatic or hydraulic valve actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.06.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.06.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.07.2004  [2004/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
Petuelring 130
80809 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
80788 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Klausnitzer, Herbert
Herrschinger Strasse 11
82266 Inning / DE
[2000/02]
Application number, filing date99109776.718.05.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateDE199812985705.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19829857
[2000/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971098
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971098
Date:30.07.2003
Language:DE
[2003/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:F01L9/02
[2000/02]
CPC:
F01L9/16 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/38]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Brennkraftmaschine mit einem pneumatischen oder hydraulischen Aktuator für ein Gaswechsel-Hubventil[2000/02]
English:Engine with pneumatic or hydraulic valve actuator[2000/02]
French:Moteur muni d'actionneur de soupape à commande pneumatique ou hydraulique[2000/02]
Examination procedure26.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/34]
04.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.05.2003Fee for grant paid
23.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
22.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US3844528  (MASSIE P);
 [X]GB2206646  (INNES GWENDOLINE) [X] 1 * abstract *;
 [AD]DE4132891  (AUDI AG [DE]) [AD] 1,2 * column 3, lines 5-14; figure 1; claim - *;
 [A]US5253619  (RICHESON WILLIAM E [US], et al);
 [X]US5713316  (STURMAN ODED E [US]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 25 - column 4, line 19; figures 2,4 *
ExaminationDE1866548U
by applicantDE4132891
 DE19515142
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.