EP0968945 - Unwinding device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.07.2004 [2004/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BHS Corrugated Maschinen- und Anlagenbau GmbH Hüttenwerkstrasse 1 92729 Weiherhammer / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states BHS CORRUGATED MASCHINEN- UND ANLAGENBAU GmbH Hüttenwerkstrasse 1 92729 Weiherhammer / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gnan, Alfons Ziegelanger 20 92249 Vilseck / DE | [2000/01] | Representative(s) | Rau, Manfred, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/01] | Rau, Manfred, Dr. Dipl.-Ing., et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 99109912.8 | 20.05.1999 | [2000/01] | Priority number, date | DE1998124695 | 03.06.1998 Original published format: DE 19824695 | [2000/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0968945 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0968945 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | [2000/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0968945 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65H19/12, B65H16/06 | [2000/34] | CPC: |
B65H16/06 (EP,US);
B65H19/126 (EP,US);
B65H2511/12 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/12, B65H2220/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/01] | B65H19/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/19] |
Former [2000/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Abroll-Einrichtung | [2000/01] | English: | Unwinding device | [2000/01] | French: | Dispositif de déroulage | [2000/01] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/47] | 24.02.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 16.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.04.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2392912 (BUGNONE ALDO [IT]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 20 - page 5, line 11; figure - *; | [Y]EP0289749 (JAGENBERG AG [DE]) [Y] 1-7 * column 2, line 55 - column 6, line 17; figure - *; | [Y]DE4008897 (MAIER PETER [DE]) [Y] 1-7 * column 2, line 22 - line 36 * * column 4, line 67 - column 5, line 25; figure - *; | [A]DE4224309 (OZCARIZ BASTERRA LAUREANO [ES], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0629574 (BIELOMATIK LEUZE & CO [DE]) [AD] 1* figure - * |