EP0961019 - Method for the operation of a direct-injected internal-combustion engine during the start [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | For:DE
Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/52] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
For:DE
Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | |||
Former [2007/18] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
For:BE
CH
DE
DK
LI
DaimlerChrysler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | |||
Former [2006/29] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
For:BE
CH
DE
DK
LI
DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | |||
Former [1999/48] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
CY
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70546 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eisath, Christoph Haibachaecker 7 94353 Haibach / DE | 02 /
Holtschmit, Wolf-Eike Am Schillerpark 13 66333 Völklingen / DE | 03 /
Weber, Stefan-Max Steinweg 5 93059 Regensburg / DE | 04 /
Bauer, Bernd Ina-Weidel-Weg 34 73732 Esslingen / DE | 05 /
Heidenfelder, Hans Dieter Luikenweg 10 71334 Waiblingen / DE | 06 /
Lux, Christoph Chamissostrasse 10 70193 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/32] |
Former [1999/48] | 01 /
Eisath, Christoph Haibachaecker 7 94353 Haibach / DE | ||
02 /
Holtschmit, Wolf-Eike Am Schillerpark 13 66333 Völklingen / DE | |||
03 /
Weber, Stefan-Max Steinweg 5 93059 Regensburg / DE | |||
04 /
Bauer, Bernd Ina-Weidel-Weg 34 73732 Esslingen / DE | |||
05 /
Heidenfelder, Hans Dieter Luikenweg 10 71334 Waiblingen / DE | |||
06 /
Lux, Christoph Chamissostrasse 10 70193 Suttgart / DE | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/02] | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG CT IP Com E Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/30] | Berg, Peter, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/07] | Zedlitz, Peter, et al Patentanwalt, Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/48] | Epping, Wilhelm, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwalt Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99109936.7 | 20.05.1999 | [1999/48] | Priority number, date | DE19981023280 | 25.05.1998 Original published format: DE 19823280 | [1999/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0961019 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0961019 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | [2001/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0961019 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/11] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP0961019 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/06, F02D41/22, F02D41/36 | [1999/48] | CPC: |
F02D41/3818 (EP,US);
F02D41/064 (EP,US);
F02D41/3076 (EP,US);
F02D41/401 (EP,US);
F02D2200/0602 (EP,US);
F02D41/3029 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/32] |
Former [1999/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Betreiben einer direkteinspritzenden Brennkraftmaschine während des Starts | [1999/48] | English: | Method for the operation of a direct-injected internal-combustion engine during the start | [1999/48] | French: | Procédé pour le fonctionnement d'un moteur à combustion interne à injection directe au démarrage | [1999/48] | Examination procedure | 21.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/30] | 20.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE19729811 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,2 * column A * * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 31 * * column 3, line 2 - line 57 * * column 7, line 66 - column 8, line 4 * * column 8, line 47 - column 9, line 11 * * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]DE4020298 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,2 * column 7, line 37 - column 8, line 11 *; | [A]JPH04321747 ; | [A]DE19622757 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 3 * column A *; | [A]DE19739786 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 8 * column 5, line 28 - line 47 *; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930325), vol. 017, no. 151, Database accession no. (M - 1387), & JP04321747 A 19921111 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [DA] - FRAIDL G ET AL, OTTO - DIREKTEINSPRITZUNG EIN GANZHEITLICHER SYSTEMANSATZ GASOLINE DIRECT INJECTION AN INTEGRATED SYSTEMS APPROACH, AVL TAGUNG MOTOR UND UMWELT - CONFERENCE ENGINE AND ENVIRONMENT, XX, XX, PAGE(S) 255,257-271, XP000992233 [DA] 1 * column W * | by applicant | - AVL TAGUNG MOTOR UND UMWELT, Otto-Direkteinspritzung- ein ganzheitlicher systemansatz, (1997), page 255-271 |