blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0961077

EP0961077 - Lamp holder device for an articulated lamp assembly comprising a light head [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.03.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.05.2003  [2003/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VLM-W. Murjahn GmbH & Co.
Am Korreshof 15-17
40822 Mettmann / DE
[1999/48]
Inventor(s)01 / Murjahn, Wolfgang
Am Korreshof 15-17
40822 Mettmann / DE
02 / Richarz, Peter
Gräfrather Str. 37
42329 Wuppertal / DE
[1999/48]
Representative(s)Feder, Wolf-Dietrich, et al
Dr. Wolf-D. Feder, Dr. Heinz Feder
Dipl.-Ing. P.-C. Sroka
Dominikanerstrasse 37
40545 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/48]Feder, Wolf-Dietrich, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al
Dr. Wolf-D. Feder, Dr. Heinz Feder Dipl.-Ing. P.-C. Sroka Dominikanerstrasse 37
40545 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date99110037.121.05.1999
[1999/48]
Priority number, dateDE199812297425.05.1998         Original published format: DE 19822974
[1999/48]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0961077
Date:01.12.1999
Language:DE
[1999/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0961077
Date:08.03.2000
[2000/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.01.2000
ClassificationIPC:F21V19/00
[1999/48]
CPC:
F21V19/00 (EP); H01R33/22 (EP)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   DK,   FR,   IT,   NL [2000/46]
Former [1999/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Lampenträgereinrichtung an einer Gelenkleuchte mit einem Strahlerkopf[1999/48]
English:Lamp holder device for an articulated lamp assembly comprising a light head[1999/48]
French:Dispositif porte-lampe pour luminaire à bras articulés comprenant une tête d'éclairage[1999/48]
Examination procedure05.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/44]
09.09.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
07.12.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE
07.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.10.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/18]
27.11.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
04.10.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
04.10.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0701091  (MURJAHN KG VLM [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,9-12,15 * column 4, line 17 - line 29 * * column 5, line 7 - line 28 * * column 6, line 3 - line 15 * * figures 1,4,8A * [A] 16,23;
 [XA]DE9305897U  (BRÖKELMANN, JAEGER & BUSSE) [X] 1,2,5,9-12,23 * page 5, line 23 - page 6, line 2 * * page 6, line 14 - line 17 * * page 6, line 29 - page 7, line 2 * * page 7, line 17 - page 8, line 23 * * figures 1,4,5,8,9 * [A] 15;
 [XA]EP0664584  (BROEKELMANN JAEGER & BUSSE [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,9-11 * column 4, line 16 - line 26 * * column 4, line 37 - column 5, line 2 * * column 5, line 17 - line 27 * * column 6, line 21 - line 25 * * figures 2-4 * [A] 12,16,23
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.